Talon Research, LLC v. Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Talon Research, LLC
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc. and Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.
Miscellaneous: SanDisk Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv04819
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING 129 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 127 Stipulation to Modify Case Management. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/8/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laporte for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RELATING CASES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/3/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talon Research, LLC v. Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talon Research, LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Schutz
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: David L. Leichtman
Represented By: Oren D. Langer
Represented By: Miles A. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel K Azar
Represented By: Robert M. Masters
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Nier
Represented By: Steven Lee Park
Represented By: Igor V. Timofeyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Gabriel K Azar
Represented By: Robert M. Masters
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Nier
Represented By: Steven Lee Park
Represented By: Igor V. Timofeyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc.
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SanDisk Corporation
Represented By: An Phuoc Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?