Felix v. Safeway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Felix
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv05005
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/8/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/13/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/9/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix v. Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Felix
Represented By: Kevin Todd Barnes
Represented By: Giuseppe Joseph Antonelli
Represented By: Janelle Christine Carney
Represented By: Sahag Majarian, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: R. Brian Dixon
Represented By: Laura Emily Hayward
Represented By: Michael Francis McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?