Upshaw v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Kazeem Upshaw
Defendant: Anthony Batts, City of Oakland and Oakland Police Department
Case Number: 4:2011cv05044
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/22/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Vacating Trial Date. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/10/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE AND ORDER RE CHANGE IN TRIAL DATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/24/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/13/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/01/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2013. Further Case Management Conference previously set on 4/17/2013 01:30 PM VACATED AND RESCHEDULED to 7/3/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/12/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2013 01:30 PM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 38 Stipulation.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 7/25/2012 to 10/17/2012 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/19/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File a Revised Amended Complaint filed by Kazeem Upshaw. Motion hearing VACATED. Amended Complaint due by 6/28/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/21/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Instructing Plaintiff to Correct Docket Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/31/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting in Part 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/17/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upshaw v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazeem Upshaw
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?