Minichino v. First California Realty et al
Plaintiff: Marie Minichino
Defendant: Dane Faber, Sherrie Faber and First California Realty
Case Number: 4:2011cv05185
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR THE PURPOSE OF DETERMINING WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/31/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STANDING ORDER (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/21/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/16/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/30/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/8/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minichino v. First California Realty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First California Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Minichino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?