MediaTek Inc. v. Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Plaintiff: MediaTek Inc.
Defendant: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv05341
Filed: November 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER OF DISMISSAL NUNC PRO TUNC AS OF SEPTEMBER 22, 2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/4/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER GRANTING FREESCALE'S MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE AUGUST 18, 2014 HEARING TRANSCRIPT re 615 Transcript PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 59. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/18/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 659 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 660 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO SLIDES OFFERED AS DEMONSTRATIVES IN CONNECTION WITH FREESCALES EXPERTS TESTIMONY Signed by Judge YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS on 9/10/2014. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER REGARDING SUBSTITUTION OF WITNESSES re 639 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Substitution of Witnesses filed by MediaTek Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/28/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/26/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 620 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/20/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/14/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: JURY ISSUES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER GRANTING ADDITIONAL JOINT STIPULATIONS FOR TRIAL PURPOSES re 467 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ADDITIONAL JOINT STIPULATIONS FOR TRIAL PURPOSES filed by MediaTek Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/1/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER IN ADVANCE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 1, 2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/28/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY EXCERPTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER DENYING FREESCALE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY re 508 MOTION to Strike or for Leave to File a Reply filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/23/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 547 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 537 Motion to Intervene. The motion hearing set for June 10, 2014 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER VACATING CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE.The Court VACATES the continued Pretrial Conference set for April 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/21/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ROBERT E. CAMORS, JR. re 501 Notice (Other) filed by MediaTek Inc., Attorney Robert E. Camors, Jr terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/15/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER DIRECTING SUBMISSION OF DISPUTED DISCOVERY DESIGNATIONS; VACATING APRIL 11, 2014 CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Gonzalez Rogers on 4/8/14. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 476 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3 RE: EXPERT TESTIMONY AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/5/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 466 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FEBRUARY 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 296 MediaTek's Motion to Strike Improper Expert Opinions of Dr. Frank Vahid filed by MediaTek Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/21/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER CONFIRMING JOINT STATEMENT OF PRETRIAL TASKS (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER DENYING FREESCALE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NON-INFRINGEMENT DUE TO EXTRATERRITORIAL SALES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 433 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 RE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph Spero for Settlement Conference on 2/26/2014. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/28/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The Wednesday, 2/26/2014 at 9:00am Pretrial Conference date is VACATED. The 2/24/2014 Jury Trial date is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/10/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER DENYING FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.S MOTION FOR ADVERSE INFERENCES (Dkt. No. 308). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/31/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL FILINGS RELATED TO FREESCALES MOTION FOR ADVERSE INFERENCES (Dkt. Nos. 308, 334 & 352). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/18/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/24/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying in part and granting in part 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER Expert Discovery due by 10/25/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Roge rs. 10 Day Jury Trial set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for 1/17/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/22/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 249 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/10/2013 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER RE: MEDIATEKS REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION WITH RESPECT TO DOCKET NO. 181 (Dkt. No. 235). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/20/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER RE: MEDIATEK'S SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND FREESCALES'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (Dkt. Nos. 128-4 & 130-4)***This is the public version of docket no. 232 ***. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Dkt. Nos. 133, 138, 139, 141, 160, 180, 181, 183, 185, 188, and 198). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 28, 2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 142 Administr ative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 128 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal & granting 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013). Please not that docket no. 145 and docket no. 148 are the same document.
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: MEDIATEKS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS AMENDED DISCLOSURE OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND FREESCALES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (Dkt. Nos. 128 & 130). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/29/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/16/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Dkt. No. 93). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 87 MediaTek's Administrative Motion to Seal on Reply ; Directing Freescale to File Patrick Declarations in Public Record. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Magistate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 74 Discovery Letter Brief (Motion to Compel) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Proposed Order Regarding Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/21/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER STRIKING 55 MOTION to Compel Responses by Freescale Semiconductor to Interrogatory Nos. 2-21 filed by MediaTek Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 41 Motion For Leave, if Necessary, to Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) Modified on 7/20/2012 (fs, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MediaTek Inc. v. Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MediaTek Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dowd
Represented By: Craig Evan Davis
Represented By: Joseph Francis Haag
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Keith Leonard Slenkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Rudolph Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?