Lota v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Miguel Lota
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv05777
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 84 Motion for Attorney Fees (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order Vacating Motion Hearing; Order to Show Cause. Motion hearing set for 11/5/2013 02:00 PM is VACATED. Order to Show Cause Hearing SET for 11/8/2013 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/2013. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 4/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Friday, 5/31/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 63 Notice (Other) filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., 64 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Jean Lota, Miguel Lota. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 4/5/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: PRETRIAL INSTRUCTIONS Case Management Conference set 1/28/2013 is VACATED.Compliance Hearing set for 5/10/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for submission of briefs re: petition for guardian ad litem re 33 . Plaintiff may file his brief within 5 days of the stipulated protective order being entered. Defendant may file a brief within days after receiving Plaintiff's brief. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/25/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF REFERRAL and ORDER (1) regarding further submissions in support of 19 Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and (2) setting hearing date. Mr. Lota's attorney shall file a letter brief (not to exceed 5 pages) and additional d eclaration(s) by May 18, 2012. Defendant may, but need not, file a letter brief in response by May 25, 2012. Further, the court sets a hearing on 19 Mr. Lota's counsel's Petition on June 21, 2012 at 11:00 in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/1/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESCHEDULING Case Management Conference set for Wednesday, 4/11/12 is VACATED. Case Management Conference re-set for Monday, 4/16/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lota v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Lota
Represented By: Victor Clark Thuesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Donald Choi
Represented By: James T. Conley
Represented By: Andrew J. Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?