Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc, Port Townsend Airwatchers and Greenpeace, Inc.
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency and Lisa P. Jackson
Intervenor: American Forest & Paper Association
Case Number: 4:2011cv06059
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that Consent Decree is terminated and this case is Dismissed with Prejudice re 45 Consent MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Lisa P. Jackson, United States Environmental Protection Agency, 46 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/23/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS granting 42 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER [MODIFIED] CONTINUING CASE MANAGMEMENT CONFERENCE. The 5/21/2012 Case Management Conference is VACATED. Denying as Moot the 29 Consent MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Lisa P. Jackson, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Case Management Conference is reset for 7/2/2012 02:00 PM. Telephonic appearances will not be allowed. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 8 Motion to Intervene (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DISREGARD ENTRY. DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF MEDIATOR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/23/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/23/2012 (fs, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc
Represented By: Vera Prinz Pardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Townsend Airwatchers
Represented By: Helen Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Helen Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Norman L. Rave, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson
Represented By: Norman L. Rave, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Forest & Paper Association
Represented By: Russell S. Frye
Represented By: Martin James Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?