Powertech Technology Inc v. Tessera, Inc.
Plaintiff: Powertech Technology Inc
Defendant: Tessera, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv06121
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 13, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REGARDING ( 457 , 462 ) MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS JANUARY 15, 2014 ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER REGARDING COURT-APPOINTED EXPERT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/22/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ([352-2], 407 ) CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PTIS 300 MOTION TO SET A DEADLINE FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL EXPERTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 127 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DAVID SUNS 286 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM A NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PTIS 220 MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND GRANTING PTIS 239 MOTION TO FILE A RESPONSE TO TESSERAS OBJECTION TO REPLY EVIDENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 223 Stipulation re 220 MOTION to Stay re 215 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 206 Special Masters Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting 186 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING UNOPPOSED 177 MOTION TO WITHDRAW STIPULATION, DENYING AS MOOT 173 MOTION TO SEAL, AND REFERRING 174 MOTION TO SEAL TO THE SPECIAL MASTER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER REFERRING 156 MOTION TO SEAL TO THE SPECIAL MASTER AND ADDRESSING DOCKET NO. 160. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 157 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER REFERRING 149 MOTION TO SEAL (Docket No. 149) TO THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/12/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART 115 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND GRANTING 118 MOTION TO WITHDRAW DECLARATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 94 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 20 MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 86 STIPULATION re: Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF KENNETH J. WEATHERWAX AS COUNSEL. Attorney Kenneth James Weatherwax terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 69 Notice of Change In Counsel. Attorney Nathan Nobu Lowenstein terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 40 . 47 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND DENYING PARTIES 49 STIPULATIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/30/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 24 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND DENYING PARTIES 25 STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 5 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powertech Technology Inc v. Tessera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powertech Technology Inc
Represented By: Michael F. Heafey
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Represented By: Matthew John Hult, Esq.
Represented By: Denise Marie Mingrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessera, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lipner
Represented By: Nathan Nobu Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?