Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Davis
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Bill Davis
Case Number: 4:2011cv06166
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/13/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 78 Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule Pursuant to Local Rule 16-2(d) to Continue Only the Hearing Date for Dispositive Motions and Final Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 67 STIPULATION For Relief from Case Management Schedule Pursuant to Local Rule 16-2(e)Stipulation. 68 Motion is moot. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 54 MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED 46 ORDER GRANTING 43 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/4/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 43 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 28 MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 16 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Davis
Represented By: Steve M. Defilippis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?