Karuhn v. Citibank, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carri Karuhn
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc. and Citibank, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv06192
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Carri Karuhn, CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, Inc., ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/27/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 5/31/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 11 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. Case Management Conference is set 12/10/12 at 2:00pm. The 7/3/12 hearing date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Carri Karuhn. Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration Hearing re-set for 7/3/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/24/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karuhn v. Citibank, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Parker Alexander
Represented By: Monica Nasrine Dournaee
Represented By: Edward Dean Totino
Represented By: Perrie Michael Weiner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Parker Alexander
Represented By: Monica Nasrine Dournaee
Represented By: Edward Dean Totino
Represented By: Perrie Michael Weiner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carri Karuhn
Represented By: Rami Allon Yomtov
Represented By: Dennis Frank Moss
Represented By: Sahag Majarian, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?