Megaupload Ltd v. Universal Music Group Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff Megaupload seeks injunctive relief and damages for misrepresentation of copyright claims under the DMCA for Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc.'s allegedly improper DMCA takedown notices and assertion of copyright infringement against Megaupload for posting Megaupload's promotional video.

Plaintiff: Megaupload Ltd
Defendant: Universal Music Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv06216
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 21 Motion for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 24, 2012 Filing 38 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 23, 2012, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Triska, Telephone number (650) 743-8425; christinetriska@sbcglobal.net. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2012. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 37 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2012 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 1/23/2012) re 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Megaupload Ltd. (Court Reporter: Christine Triska) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, INC. by Megaupload Ltd (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 35 Declaration of Jared Smith in Support of 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE filed byMegaupload Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/20/2012) Modified on 1/23/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2012 Filing 34 REPLY (re 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE ) filed byMegaupload Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ira P. Rothken, # 2 Exhibit A to Rothken Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Rothken Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Rothken Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Rothken Declaration)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE (re 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference filed byUniversal Music Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 3 Declaration of Clifton A. Lancaster, # 4 Declaration of Jeffrey Harleston)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 30 Motion to Shorten Time (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE. Responses due by 1/10/2012. Replies due by 1/17/2012. Motion Hearing reset for 1/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 31 RESPONSE (re 30 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE ) filed byUniversal Music Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Megaupload Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ira P. Rothken in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE 21 is reset for 2/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE for Discovery purposes re 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Responses due by 1/24/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 27, 2011 Filing 24 Proposed Order re 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE by Megaupload Ltd. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 12/27/2011) Modified on 12/28/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Filing 23 Declaration of KIM DOTCOM in Support of 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Megaupload Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 12/27/2011) Modified on 12/28/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Filing 22 Declaration of Ira P. Rothken in Support of 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Megaupload Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 12/27/2011) Modified on 12/28/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Megaupload Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/10/2012. Replies due by 1/17/2012. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 12/27/2011) Modified on 12/28/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Filing 20 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 23, 2011 Filing 19 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Universal Music Group Inc. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 12/23/2011) Modified on 12/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2011 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megaupload Ltd re 5 Application and Memorandum for TRO, 7 Proposed Order, 8 Certificate of Service, 6 Declaration in Support (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 5 Motion for TRO (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 17 RESPONSE (re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) Defendant's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Ex Parte Application for TRO filed byUniversal Music Group Inc. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 16 Supplemental Declaration of Kim Dotcom in Support of 5 Motion for temporary restraining order and order to show cause re preliminary injunction filed byMegaupload Ltd. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Modified on 12/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2011 Filing 15 REPLY (re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) and Order to Show Cause filed byMegaupload Ltd. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 14 RESPONSE (re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) > filed byUniversal Music Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kelly M. Klaus, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus, # 7 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Universal Music Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A., Other Affiliate UMG Recordings, Inc. for Universal Music Group Inc. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hugh Blavin and Kelly M. Klaus on behalf of Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megaupload Ltd. Universal Music Group Inc served on 12/13/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) Modified on 12/29/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on December 14, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 10 EXHIBITS re 9 Statement Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Statement filed byMegaupload Ltd. (Related document(s) 9 ) (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 9 Statement re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Statement by Megaupload Ltd. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megaupload Ltd re 7 Proposed Order, 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 1 Complaint, 6 Declaration in Support (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Filing 7 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction by Megaupload Ltd. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Filing 6 Declaration of Kim Dotcom in Support of 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction filed byMegaupload Ltd. (Related document(s) 5 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction filed by Megaupload Ltd. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2012 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Universal Music Group Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Megaupload Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A. for Universal Music Group Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Demand against Universal Music Group Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611068030.). Filed byMegaupload Ltd. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kc, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Megaupload Ltd v. Universal Music Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megaupload Ltd
Represented By: Jennifer Lloyd Kelly
Represented By: Liwen Arius Mah
Represented By: Laurence F. Pulgram
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Represented By: Erin Anne Simon
Represented By: Jared Robinson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Kelly M Klaus
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?