Primo v. Pacific Biosciences of California Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Primo
Defendant: Pacific Biosciences of California Inc, Hugh C. Martin, Susan K. Barnes and Brian B. Dow
Case Number: 4:2011cv06599
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 73 MOTION TO STAY AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS 80 CROSS- MOTIONS TO ENJOIN STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS AND LIFT THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 76 Stipulation RE SCHEDULING ORDER (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING ( 56 , 61 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 18 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primo v. Pacific Biosciences of California Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Primo
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Biosciences of California Inc
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh C. Martin
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan K. Barnes
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian B. Dow
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?