PQ Labs, Inc. et al v. Qi et al
Plaintiff: PQ Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Yang Qi, Zaagtech Inc., Andy Nguyen, Jinpeng Li and Haipeng Li
Case Number: 4:2012cv00450
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Vacating Hearing on 215 Plaintiffs' motion for assignment order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/06/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 195 Motion for Attorney Fees. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 203 Stipulation Re Extension of Time to File Opposition Re. Dkt. No. 195 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/30/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON 92 , 150 , 158 , 164 , 176 , 179 , 186 MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 170 Stipulation Regarding Post Trial Briefing Schedule. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 145 RENEWED MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 151 Motion for Permission to Bring Electronic Equipment for Trial. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( 115 , 118 ) MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE SEALING MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 119 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS 78 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT GRANTING DEFENDANTS 96 MOTION TO AMEND. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 82 Stipulation to Revise Briefing Schedule re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 76 Stipulation to extend deadline to conduct mediation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 59 Discovery Letter Brief REDACTED filed by Jinpeng Li, Yang Qi, Haipeng Li, Zaagtech Inc., PQ Labs, Inc. Granting request to extend expert discovery to 10/9/2013. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/26/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE REFERRED DISCOVERY. Motion to Compel due by 8/28/2013 at noon. Responses due by 9/4/2013 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/23/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 50 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 42 MOTION TO STRIKE AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO AMEND. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 23 MOTIONS TO DISMISS, GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 23 MOTION TO STRIKE AND GRANTING DEFENDANT NGUYEN'S 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 12 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 12 EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Motions terminated: 17 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to TRO. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PQ Labs, Inc. et al v. Qi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PQ Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Otto Oswald Lee
Represented By: Kevin C Viau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Qi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaagtech Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinpeng Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haipeng Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?