Tynan v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Tynan
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv00739
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/31/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/1/2013 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/25/2013.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tynan v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tynan
Represented By: G. Thomas Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Represented By: Danielle Renee Teeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?