Brooks v. Washington Mutual, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter S. Brooks
Defendant: Washington Mutual, Inc. and JP Morgan Chase
Case Number: 4:2012cv00765
Filed: February 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO 11/15/2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/26/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 36 Letter filed by Peter S. Brooks ]. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES WHATSOEVER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/10/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING CLARIFICATION AND POSTPONING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 20 Amended Complaint, filed by Peter S. Brooks. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Washington Mutual, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Hedger
Represented By: Charles Scott Greene
Represented By: Sean David Muntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Represented By: Charles Scott Greene
Represented By: John Charles Hedger
Represented By: Sean David Muntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?