Critchlow v. Critchlow et al
Plaintiff: Robert W. Critchlow
Defendant: Kate E. Critchlow and John A. Waner
Case Number: 4:2012cv01198
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 57 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 57 Motion to Amend/Correct.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STRIKING 47 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Robert W. Critchlow and ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED OPPOSITION BY 2:00 P.M. TODAY, FRIDAY, JANUARY 25, 2013. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/28/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/17/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Critchlow v. Critchlow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Critchlow
Represented By: Robert M. Vantress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate E. Critchlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Waner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?