Nissim v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jack A. Nissim
Defendant: Nicholas Dudum, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., First American Title Company and Atlantic Bancorp
Case Number: 4:2012cv01201
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 57 Motion to Relate Case. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING WELLS FARGOS 49 MOTION TO DISMISS (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING ( 17 , 37 , and 39 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a) terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON WELL FARGOS SECOND 39 MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, MAINTAINING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 37 FIRST AMERICANS MOTION TO DISMISS, VACATING HEARINGS AND ADDRESSING SERVICE UPON OTHER DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/30/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: COURT CONNECTED MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissim v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Dudum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack A. Nissim
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?