September 28, 2015 |
Filing
214
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
210
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 208 TO CONTINUE JULY 2, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by American Security Insurance Company Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 9/24/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing
206
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 205 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER continuing December 11, 2014 Case Management Conference and Staying Case pending Resolution of Fladell Appeals; Supporting Declaration filed by American Security Insurance Company Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
203
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 202 Continuing October 7, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by American Security Insurance Company Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/4/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
180
ORDER GRANTING re 175 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay 174 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
170
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 146 148 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
162
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 159 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
154
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint, 145 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 146 MOTION to Dismiss Plaint iffs' Claims Under the RICO Act</i filed by Patricia R. Cannon, Cheryl Bullock, Stanley D. Cannon, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint, 145 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 146 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under the RICO Act</i, 146 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under the RICO Act, 148 MOTION to Dis miss Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 12/2/2013. Replies due by 12/20/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
|
October 30, 2013 |
Filing
145
ORDER granting 143 STIPULATION to respond to TAC and setting briefing schedule. WF response due 11/1/2013, ASIC response due 11/4/2013. Responses to motions to dismiss due by 11/20/2013. Replies due by 11/27/2013. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
126
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing
123
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Patricia R. Cannon, Cheryl Bullock, Stanley D. Cannon Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
|
July 5, 2013 |
Filing
116
114 AMENDED ORDER granting 106 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/5/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
|
July 2, 2013 |
Filing
114
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 106 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
|
May 20, 2013 |
Filing
111
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 106 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Extending Time for Reply to Opposition filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Replies due by 5/28/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
|
January 23, 2013 |
Filing
98
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC FROM 1/29/13 TO 2/28/13 AT 10:30 A.M. re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
94
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 57 59 60 61 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
55
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULES 7-2(B) AND 7-3(A) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing
50
ORDER DENYING APPEARANCE BY PHONE AND RESETTING CMC FROM 8/24/12 TO 9/7/12 AT 9:00 A.M. ALL LEAD COUNSEL MUST APPEAR IN PERSON re 49 . Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
48
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
46
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 to Extend Time for Federal National Mortgage Association to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
|
June 14, 2012 |
Filing
8
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 6/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
|