Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Hsing
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Eric K. Hsing
Case Number: 4:2012cv01530
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying without prejudice 84 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 85 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 86 Motion for Default Judgment (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/24/2013. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:FAILURE TO FILE TIMELY JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 6/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/3/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 40 Motion to Amend Cross-Complaint;Defendant and Counterclaimant is required to E-FILE the amended document by 3/15/2013.(The 3/12/2013 Hearing date is VACATED.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying without Prejudice 33 Motion to Amend Cross-Complaint. The Court VACATES the hearing set for January 29, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Without Leave to Amend. The Court VACATES the August 21, 2012 hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Hsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Susan Deann Condon
Represented By: Valerie Margo Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K. Hsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?