Tilei v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Plaintiff: Punaofo Tsugito Tilei
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 4:2012cv01688
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC GAW
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING DISCOVERY ORDER (Dkt. No.83) re 94 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by B. Jeffery, Meyer, Ingram, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, A. Alton, G. Ramey, Sanchez, 95 Order on Motion for M iscellaneous Relief, 92 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 90 Discovery Order filed by Punaofo Tsugito Tilei. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/8/2017. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 20, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/20/2017. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
September 28, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/28/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 11, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 09/11/2017. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
August 31, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re Dkt. Nos. 76, 80. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/31/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
March 1, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Sanchez re 48 Notice filed by Punaofo Tsugito Tilei. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 03/01/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
April 22, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/22/16. (Certificate of Service Attached)(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016) Modified on 4/22/2016 (napS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilei v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Punaofo Tsugito Tilei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?