Adams v. Vivo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Adams
Defendant: Vivo, Inc. and Genomic Health Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv01854
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER to Submit Additional Information re 78 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, Rule 41 filed by Mark Adams Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/18/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 69 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and denying 75 Motion to Stay.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/10/2012 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 64 Motion for Extension of ENE Deadline.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to Submit Additional Information re 69 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Application to Proceed Informa Pauperis filed by Mark Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/03/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 64 MOTION to Extend ENE Session Deadline filed by Mark Adams Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/29/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 59 . Amended Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 49 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF MARK LETELL ADAMS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(f) filed by Vivo, Inc., Genomic Health Inc. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2013 01:30 PM. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Discharging 55 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/29/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Amended Order to Show Cause. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 54 . (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend; denying 6 Motion to Strike. Amended complaint due 8/16/2012.(hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Motions terminated: 23 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Mark Adams.Replies due by 7/12/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/26/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/4/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Vivo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivo, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Hodur
Represented By: Deverie Jean Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genomic Health Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Hodur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?