Bohannon v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Glynnis Bohannon
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv01894
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/24/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 23, 2012 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request For Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/23/2012) Modified on 4/24/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2012 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES AND RELATED PAPERS COMPLAINT FILED re 4 by Facebook, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/18/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA re 1 by Facebook, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/18/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 3 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Local Rjule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 2 Declaration of Bill Richardson in Support of Notice of Removal re 1 filed by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 1 Alleged Class Action NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS); jury demand; from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 112CV219256. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611011708). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) Modified on 4/17/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2012: # 2 Exhibit-A, # 3 Exhibit-B, # 4 Exhibit-C: Complaint, # 5 Exhibit-D) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2012: # 6 Exhibit-E, # 7 Exhibit-F: First Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit-G, # 9 Exhibit-H, # 10 Exhibit-I) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohannon v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynnis Bohannon
Represented By: John R. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Kristine Anne Van Hamersveld
Represented By: Kristine Anne Van Hamersveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?