Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Blue Ridge Investments, L.L.C., LoanCity and Richard D. Soukoulis
Case Number: 4:2012cv02460
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Re Status of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/20/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re Joint Letter re Settlement Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/11/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The court has reviewed the parties' 2/28/2013 joint letter regarding a settlement dispute. Per the parties' request, they shall continue their direct negotiations, and shall lodge a joint status letter with Judge Ryu by no later than 3/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/6/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to Submit Joint Letter re Settlement Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/15/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REOPENING CASE, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2013 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/12/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 25 Stipulation; finding as moot 26 Motion to Reopen Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 22 Order Dismissing Case Joint Stipulation Requesting Extension of Automatic Dismissal Deadline in Court's November 14, 2012 Order filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, LoanCity, Richard D. Soukoulis, Blue Ridge Investments, L.L.C., Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/14/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 17 Stipulation Requesting Referral to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Early Settlement Conference, and to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint, Initial Disclosures, Rule 26(f) Report, and Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2012 02:30 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/8/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified on 8/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Investments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Soukoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: James D. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?