Williams v. County of Alameda, The et al
Plaintiff: Curtis D. Williams
Defendant: County of Alameda, The, Kevin H. Estep, Thomas F. Madigan, Mario M. Felix, Brian R. Fernandez, Michael J. Giammalvo, Micah Bennett and Luis Santamaria
Case Number: 4:2012cv02511
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 68 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues / Certificate of Service. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 59 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (denying 46 Motion to Strike and 47 Motion to Dismiss ) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW re 52 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Discovery Order re: in camera review. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DISCOVERY ORDER RE: NAMED DEFENDANTS INTERNAL AFFAIRS FILES re: 51 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/27/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 40 Motion for Leave to File; denying 18 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, Motions terminated: 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION DEADLINE filed by Micah Bennett, Curtis D. Williams, Luis Santamaria, Michael J. Giammalvo, Thomas F. Madigan, County of Alameda, Justin Miguel, Brian R. Fernandez, Mario M. Felix, Kevin H. Estep. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STRIKING 19 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Curtis D. Williams, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 Opposition/Response to Motion, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/14/2013. Replies due by 1/21/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Allow Filing of Amended Complaint filed by Curtis D. Williams, County of Alameda, The, 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Micah Bennett, Luis Santamaria, Michael J. Giammalvo, County of Alameda, The, Thomas F. Madigan, Brian R. Fernandez, Mario M. Felix, Kevin H. Estep.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/5/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. County of Alameda, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis D. Williams
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda, The
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin H. Estep
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Madigan
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario M. Felix
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R. Fernandez
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Giammalvo
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Santamaria
Represented By: Robert Dean Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?