Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Vector General Engineering Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Vector General Engineering Contractors, Inc. and Rene Amilcar Torres
Case Number: 4:2012cv02633
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RE SERVICE OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/9/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 64 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/4/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 64 . Plaintiffs shall submit additional briefing by October 23, 2014, to address the deficiencies in the motion for default judgment. Any opposition or statement of non-opposition is due no later than October 27, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/20/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 43 Motion for Default Judgment.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 43 . Plaintiffs are advised that the court will not consider Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b) until the clerk has entered default against Defenda nt Rene Amilcar Torres dba Vector Engineering Contractors pursuant to Rule 55(a). Immediately upon receipt of this order, Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant and file proof of service with the court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/18/13. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 47 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 43 . Plaintiffs are advised that the court will not consider Plaintiffs motion for default judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b) until the clerk has entered judgment against Defendant Rene Amilcar Torres dba Vector Engineering Contractors pursuant to Rule 55(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/17/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re 44 Statement, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, et al: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2013. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 10/9/2013 09:30 AM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/23/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2013. Initial Case Management Conference previously set on 7/17/2013 01:30 PM continued to 8/28/2013 01:30 PMre 40 Statement,, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/15/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 31 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant failed to respond to the order to show cause or file a statement of nonopposition to the motion. Accordingly, the Motion 31 is GRANTED and the hearing on the Motion is VACATED. The proposed Second Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A to the Declaration of Edward D. Winchester [31-1], is deemed filed. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/30/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/4/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/29/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting continuance of Initial Case Management Conference. re 30 Statement, filed by Plaintiffs. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2013. Initial Case Management Conference previously set on 5/15/2013 1:30 PM continued to 7/17/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/10/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Updated Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2013. Initial Case Management Conference previously set 4/17/2013 01:30 PM continued to 5/15/2013 01:30 PM re 27 Statement, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust F und for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/11/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Notice of Motion and Motion for Mandatory Injunction filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Traini ng and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/13/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/30/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Status Report due by 12/28/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/21/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default Plaintiffs' Request to Lift Clerk's Entry of Default; Order Thereon filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees o f the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Moti ons terminated: 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default Plaintiffs' Request to Lift Clerk's Entry of Default; Order Thereon filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Tr ustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/16/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Vector General Engineering Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan J. Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan J. Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan J. Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan J. Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vector General Engineering Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Amilcar Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?