Mt. Lookout Chiropratic Center, Inc. v. Wei Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mt. Lookout Chiropratic Center, Inc.
Defendant: Wei Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03046
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/22/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/06/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 23 MOTION to Appear by Telephone and VACATING December 7, 2012 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/05/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Lookout Chiropratic Center, Inc. v. Wei Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mt. Lookout Chiropratic Center, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Michael Kelly
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Represented By: Brian John Wanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?