Carreon v. Inman et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Charles Carreon
Defendant: Matthew Inman, Indiegogo, Inc., National Wildlife Federation and American Cancer Society
Movant: Gino Romano
Case Number: 4:2012cv03112
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER re 32 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Cases are not related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 3, 2012 32 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 12-cv-03435. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/3/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah T. Grilli Notice of Appearance of Richard L. Grossman (Grilli, Sarah) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Carreon (Carreon, Charles) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 3, 2012 29 Declaration of Venkat Balasubramani in Support of 28 Order, 23 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMatthew Inman. (Related document(s) 28 , 23 ) (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER re 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Supplemental evidence is to be filed by Mr. Inman no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 1, 2012 25 DECLARATION of Kurt Opsahl in Opposition to 20 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Shaw Cause Re Preliminary Injunction filed byMatthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 7/1/2012)
July 1, 2012 24 DECLARATION of Matthew Inman in Opposition to 20 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Shaw Cause Re Preliminary Injunction filed byMatthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 7/1/2012)
July 1, 2012 23 RESPONSE (re 20 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Shaw Cause Re Preliminary Injunction ) filed byMatthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 7/1/2012)
July 1, 2012 22 RESPONSE (re 20 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Shaw Cause Re Preliminary Injunction ) filed byIndiegogo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ragesh K. Tangri, # 2 Exhibit A to Tangri declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Tangri declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Tangri declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Tangri declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Tangri declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Tangri declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Tangri declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Tangri declaration, # 10 Declaration of Slava Rubin, # 11 Exhibit A to Rubin declaration)(Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 7/1/2012)
June 30, 2012 21 Declaration of CHARLES CARREON in Support of 20 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Shaw Cause Re Preliminary Injunction PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 45 VI.E AND REQUEST PURSUANT TO F.R.CIV.P. 6(a)(3)(A) THAT PAPERS FILED AS DOCKET ITEM # 20 BE DEEMED FILED JUNE 28, 2012 AT 4:46 P.M. DUE TO COURT CLOSURE DUE TO INACCESSIBILITY OF COURT WEBSITE ON JUNE 28TH AND 29TH filed byCharles Carreon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order DEEMING EX PARTE APPLICATION, DOCKET # 20, FILED AS OF 4:46 P.M. JUNE 28, 2012)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Carreon, Charles) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 30, 2012 20 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Shaw Cause Re Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Carreon. (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 2 Declaration OF CHARLES CARREON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 3 Exhibit (S) A - K TO THE DECLARATION OF CHARLES CARREON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 4 Proposed Order EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUCNTION)(Carreon, Charles) (Filed on 6/30/2012)
June 28, 2012 19 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 18 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Matthew Inman (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Indiegogo, Inc. IndieGoGo Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Novikov (Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Lemley (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ragesh K. Tangri (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 25, 2012 27 MOTION to Intervene filed by Gino Romano. Responses due by 7/9/2012. Replies due by 7/16/2012. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 25, 2012 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO IMPOSE CONSTRUCTIVE CHARITABLE TRUST AND REQUIRE ACCOUNTING, FOR DAMAGES FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND CYBERVANDALISM, AND FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO ENJOIN FURTHER INFRINGEMENT AND CYBERVANDALISM against All Defendants. Filed byCharles Carreon. (Carreon, Charles) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Bradford Opsahl (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Corynne McSherry (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Zimmerman (Zimmerman, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 21, 2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charles Carreon.. (Carreon, Charles) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Venkat Balasubramani (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 15, 2012 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against American Cancer Society, Indiegogo, Inc., Matthew Inman, National Wildlife Federation ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611075321.). Filed byCharles Carreon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carreon v. Inman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Carreon
Represented By: Charles Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Inman
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Corynne McSherry
Represented By: Kurt Bradford Opsahl
Represented By: Matthew Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiegogo, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Wildlife Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cancer Society
Represented By: Sarah T. Grilli
Represented By: Richard L. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gino Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?