Stokes v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stokes
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Barclays Capital Inc., Allen & Company LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Cowen and Company, LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P. and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03203
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2012 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Stokes re 5 Motion to Remand 6 Memorandum in Support, 8 Declaration in Support, 10 Certificate of Interested Entities, 3 Notice of Appearance (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified on 6/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jennifer Stokes (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 8 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 5 Motion to Remand filed by Jennifer Stokes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 5 , 6 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified on 6/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re 5 Motion to Remand filed by Jennifer Stokes. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified on 6/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Jennifer Stokes. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified on 6/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel M. Ward (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC re 14 , 15 & 16 Disclosure Statements (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Goldman Sachs & Co.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Jennifer Stokes, Peter A. Thiel. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 13 Proposed Order re 9 Motion to Stay, by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 11 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 9 Motion to Stay, filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 9 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2012 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order - YGR)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; No Process with Jury Demand, from Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. Their case number is CIV514107. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611075441). Filed by Peter A. Thiel, Erskine B. Bowles, Reed Hastings, Donald E. Graham, James W. Breyer, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stokes
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant W Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Robert Van LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. King & Associates, Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Trade Securities, LLC.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazard Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Company
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Crest Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?