Teixeira et al v. County of Alameda et al

Plaintiff: Gary Gamaza, Calguns Foundation (CGF), Inc., Second Amendment Foundation (SAF), Inc., California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees (Cal-FFL), John Teixeira and Steve Nobriga
Defendant: County of Alameda, Alameda Board of Supervisors, Wilma Chan, Nate Miley and Keith Carson
Case Number: 4:2012cv03288
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Management. Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2013. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge 07/08/2013 on 07/08/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
April 24, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/23/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 12, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/13 is continued 4/26/2013 02:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/11/13., Motions terminated: 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Reset CMC and Extend Time to File Amended Complaint filed by California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees (Cal-FFL), Second Amendment Foundation (SAF), Inc., Calguns Foundation (CGF), Inc., Gary Gamaza, Steve Nobriga, John Teixeira. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 17, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/13 is continued to 3/29/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/17/13., Motions terminated: 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacate CMC filed by California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees (Cal-FFL), Second Amendment Foundation (SAF), Inc., Calguns Foundation (CGF), Inc., Gary Gamaza, Steve Nobriga, John Teixeira. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
December 18, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; RE-SETTING HEARING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
October 11, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/12 is continued to 1/25/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco., Motions terminated: 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to set hearing and filing deadlines filed b y California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees (Cal-FFL), Second Amendment Foundation (SAF), Inc., Calguns Foundation (CGF), Inc., Gary Gamaza, Steve Nobriga, John Teixeira.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/5/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
August 24, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: case management filed by California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees (Cal-FFL), Second Amendment Foun dation (SAF), Inc., Calguns Foundation (CGF), Inc., Gary Gamaza, Steve Nobriga, John Teixeira. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/23/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
July 10, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teixeira et al v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gamaza
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calguns Foundation (CGF), Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation (SAF), Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees (Cal-FFL)
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Teixeira
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Nobriga
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilma Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Miley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?