Angioscore, Inc. v. Trireme Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angioscore, Inc.
Defendant: QT Vascular Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., QT Vascular PTE. Ltd. and Piper Jaffray
Case Number: 4:2012cv03393
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 EXHIBITS DISPOSED in accordance with Local Rule 79-4(c). (Exhibit 32 (DVD) dkt. #523, Exhibit A (CD) dkt. #716) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 902 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re withdrawal of exhibits in accordance with Local Rule 79-4(b). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 7, 2018 Filing 901 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 900 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 9, 2018 AT 9:01 AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #898 Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Bill of Costs and Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 898 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Bill of Costs and Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, et al. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 2/2/2018) Modified on 2/5/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2017 Filing 897 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing re status of settlement set for 12/22/2017 is CONTINUED to Friday, 2/9/2018 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint filing by 2/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 896 Joint Statement by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 11/16/2017) Modified on 11/17/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING re #894 Statement filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. Compliance hearing set for 11/17/2017 is CONTINUED to Friday, 12/22/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint filing by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/16/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 894 Joint Statement by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical LLC. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 11/9/2017) Modified on 11/12/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2017 Filing 893 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Telephone Conference held on 10/27/2017.Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: NOT REPORTED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #893 Telephone Conference Compliance hearing is set for 11/17/2017 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint filing by 11/9/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 892 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING COMPLIANCE HEARING ON FRIDAY, 10/27/2017 AT 9:01AM INTO A DIAL IN TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2017 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. One office is to email a dial in telephone number and passcode for this call to the Courtroom Deputy, Frances Stone at ygrcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by 12:00pm Noon on Thursday, 10/26/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 891 Joint Statement by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 10/20/2017) Modified on 10/22/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2017 Filing 890 Acknowledgment Receipt re return of trial exhibits as to plaintiff Angioscore Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 889 Acknowledgment Receipt re return of trial exhibits as to defendants Trireme Medical, et al. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 888 NOTICE by Angioscore, Inc. to Clerk of Withdrawal of Trial Exhibits After Trial re #885 Clerk's Notice (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2017 Filing 887 NOTICE Regarding Withdrawal of Trial Exhibits re #885 Clerk's Notice by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/25/2017) Modified on 9/26/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2017 Filing 886 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing set for Friday, 9/15/2017 is CONTINUED to Friday, 10/27/2017 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 885 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re: withdrawal of trial exhibits. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 884 Supplemental FRCP 7.1 Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Angioscore, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spectranetics, Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Angioscore, Inc., Angioscore, Inc., Angioscore, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/10/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2017 Filing 883 Joint Statement by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd, QT Vascular Ltd, Eitan Konstantino. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/10/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re #881 Notice (Other) filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 9/15/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing due 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/19/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 881 JOINT NOTICE OF EXPECTED SETTLEMENT by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/13/2017) Modified on 7/14/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS ON JUNE 27, 2017 re #872 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Angioscore, Inc., #873 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/14/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 879 REPLY (re #873 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Caine, David) (Filed on 6/13/2017) Modified on 6/14/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2017 Filing 878 REPLY (re #872 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 877 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #872 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 876 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #873 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #872 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs , #873 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs . Responses due by 6/6/2017. Replies due by 6/13/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER granting stipulation #874 to modify briefing and hearing dates by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 874 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Parties' Motions to Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vasculary PTE Ltd., QT Vascular Ltd. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/19/2017) Modified on 5/19/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2017 Filing 873 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/30/2017. Replies due by 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit D44-D45, #3 Exhibit D54-D55)(Caine, David) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 15, 2017 Filing 872 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/30/2017. Replies due by 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 871 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 194,323.91 against Plaintiff. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 870 OBJECTIONS to re #868 Bill of Costs, by Angioscore, Inc.. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 869 NOTICE by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance as Attorney of Record (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 4, 2017 Filing 868 BILL OF COSTS (SECOND AMENDED) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Objections due by 4/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen, #2 Exhibit A1 - A24, #3 Exhibit B1 - B14, #4 Exhibit C1 - C115, #5 Exhibit D1 - D55, #6 Exhibit E1 - E9, #7 Exhibit F1 - F4, #8 Declaration of Jason Young, #9 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 867 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY IN BILL OF COSTS. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 866 OBJECTIONS to re #862 Bill of Costs, by Angioscore, Inc.. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #864 Stipulation re: Deadline to File Objections to Defendants' Bill of Costs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 3, 2017 Filing 864 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Deadline to File Objections to Defendants' Bill of Costs filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/3/2017) Modified on 3/3/2017 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2017 Filing 863 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Doolittle (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 862 BILL OF COSTS (AMENDED) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Objections due by 3/16/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit AMENDED D44, #4 Exhibit AMENDED D45, #5 Exhibit AMENDED D46, #6 Exhibit AMENDED D54, #7 Exhibit AMENDED D55, #8 Exhibit SUPPLEMENTAL E8, #9 Exhibit SUPPLEMENTAL E9)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 861 BILL OF COSTS by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Objections due by 3/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A1 - A24, #3 Exhibit B1 - B14, #4 Exhibit C1 - C23.1, #5 Exhibit C24 - C115, #6 Exhibit D1 - D8, #7 Exhibit D9 - D30, #8 Exhibit D31 - D39, #9 Exhibit D40 - D55, #10 Exhibit E1 - E10, #11 Exhibit F1 - F4)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 860 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 859 Reply Brief Regarding Costs filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Fairneny, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #854 , #857 ) (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 1/20/2017) Modified on 1/23/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2017 Filing 858 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM RE AVAILABILITY OF COSTS filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #854 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 1/20/2017) Modified on 1/23/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2017 Filing 857 Opening Brief Regarding Costs re #854 Order filed by Angioscore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fairneny Dec. ISO Brief, #2 Exhibit Fairneny Dec. Exh. A)(Related document(s) #854 ) (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/17/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2017 Filing 856 MEMORANDUM RE AVAILABILITY OF COSTS re #854 Order filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #854 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/17/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2017 Filing 855 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME, LOCATION ADDRESS AND EMAIL ADDRESSES by David Adam Caine. (Caine, David) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/17/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #853 Statement filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., ***Deadlines terminated: Court VACATES the Compliance hearing currently set for 1/6/17 at 9:01am. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/4/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 30, 2016 Filing 853 Joint Statement by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Caine, David) (Filed on 12/30/2016) Modified on 1/3/2017 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 852 ORDER RE: FEDERAL CIRCUIT MANDATE; SETTING COMPLIANCE re #851 USCA Mandate. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 1/6/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Statement filed by 12/30/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 851 MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #845 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #844 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016) Modified on 11/17/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2016 Filing 850 ERRATUM of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #845 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Eitan Konstantino, #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #844 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 849 USCA for the Federal Circuit: Notice of Entry of Judgment Accompanied by Opinion as to #845 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #844 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 848 OPINION of USCA for the Federal Circuit: REVERSED-IN-PART, AFFIRMED-IN-PART,VACATED-IN-PART, AND REMANDED as to #845 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #844 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd, #844 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc, #845 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Eitan Konstantino (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016) Modified on 11/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit: REVERSED-IN-PART, AFFIRMED-IN-PART,VACATED-IN-PART, AND REMANDED as to #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
January 22, 2016 Electronically mailed amended appeal package to USCA for the Federal Circuit re #844 , #845 Amended Notice of Appeals (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 845 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Eitan Konstantino as to #665 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #591 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, #841 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #843 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, #219 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #809 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, #812 JUDGMENT [* AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*], . Appeal Record due by 2/22/2016. (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 1/21/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Filing 844 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. as to #665 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #591 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, #841 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #843 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, #219 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #809 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, #812 Judgment, Terminated Case Corporate Defendants' Amended Notice of Appeal. Appeal Record due by 2/22/2016. (Caine, David) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying #835 Defendant Konstantino's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 30, 2015 Filing 842 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE TUESDAY, JANUARY 5, 2016 AT 2:00PM MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT HEARING [Dkt. No. 835]. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #827 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees. The hearing on the motion set for December 15, 2015 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 840 REPLY (re #835 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 59 ) filed byEitan Konstantino. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit: GRANTING Motions to stay enforcement of the judgment, pending disposition of these appeals and without requiring a supersedeas bond, subject to the Corporate Defendants' complying with items 2 and 3 as to #834 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Eitan Konstantino, #833 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 838 RESPONSE (re #835 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 59 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 837 REPLY (re #827 MOTION for Finding of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorney Fees ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of David A. Caine)(Caine, David) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 12, 2015 Filing 836 RESPONSE (re #827 MOTION for Finding of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorney Fees ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 12, 2015 Filing 835 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 59 filed by Eitan Konstantino. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/27/2015. Replies due by 12/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 10, 2015 Electronically mailed appeal package to USCA for the Federal Circuit re #833 , #834 Notice of appeals (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 834 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Eitan Konstantino. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9977891. Appeal Record due by 12/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT CASE NUMBER 16-1142)
November 9, 2015 Filing 833 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9977335. Appeal Record due by 12/9/2015. (Steuer, David) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT CASE NUMBER 16-1126)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit: Enforcement of the judgment is temporarily stayed, pending this courts consideration of the motion. Appeals 2016-1126, -1142 are consolidated as to #825 (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 831 Proposed Order re #827 MOTION for Finding of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorney Fees by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER of USCA Federal Circuit: Enforcement of the judgment is temporarily stayed, pending this courts consideration of the motion as to #825 USCA Case Number 16-1126 (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 10/30/2015 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2015 Filing 829 Declaration of David A. Caine in Support of #827 MOTION for Finding of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorney Fees filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part A, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34)(Related document(s) #827 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2015 Filing 828 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #827 MOTION for Finding of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorney Fees filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #827 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2015 Filing 827 MOTION for Finding of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/12/2015. Replies due by 11/19/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2015 Filing 826 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Edward White As Associated Counsel For AngioScore, Inc. (White, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 825 USCA Case Number 16-1126 Federal Circuit Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 824 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Robert E. White of the Law Offices of Robert E. White by Angioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #813 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #814 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment; denying as moot #817 Motion to Shorten Time; denying #818 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment; denying as moot #819 Motion to Shorten Time (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 822 ORDER GRANTING re #808 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Eitan Konstantino, Attorney Catherine S Grealis; Steven D. Guggenheim; Joy Gowoon Kim; Charlene Koski; Dylan James Liddiard; Edmundo Clay Marquez; Thomas James Martin; Jasmine M. Owens; David Sidney Steuer; Daniel Wagner Turbow; Rebecca E. Wolitz; Anne Simons Aufhauser and Brian Danitz terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/21/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 821 RESPONSE (re #819 MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant Eitan Konstantino's Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 820 RESPONSE (re #817 MOTION to Shorten Time on Corporate Defendants' Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert P. Feldman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 819 MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant Eitan Konstantino's Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Richard W. Buckner, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 818 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment [F.R.C.P. 62] filed by Eitan Konstantino. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/29/2015. Replies due by 11/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Konstantino, #2 Declaration Mullen, #3 Proposed Order)(Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 817 MOTION to Shorten Time on Corporate Defendants' Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Liddiard ISO Motion to Shorten Time, #2 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 816 Declaration of Gina La in Support of #814 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed byQT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #814 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 10/14/2015) Modified on 10/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 815 Declaration of Randal Farwell in Support of #814 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed byQT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #814 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 10/14/2015) Modified on 10/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 814 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Replies due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 10/14/2015) Modified on 10/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 813 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment and Supporting Declaration filed by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Danitz ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Defs' Notice of Mot and Mot to Stay Enforcement of Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Defs' Notice of Mot and Mot to Stay Enforcement of Judgment, #5 Redacted Version of Farwell's Decl ISO Motion, #6 Unredacted Version of Farwell's Decl ISO Motion, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 812 JUDGMENT [* AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*], ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/14/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 811 Joint Statement re: Judgment by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., QT Vascular Ltd., Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hausman, Claire) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2015 Filing 810 Joint Statement re: Judgment by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd, QT Vascular Ltd., et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #785 Motion ; denying #797 Motion to Shorten Time (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 808 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Eitan Konstantino. Responses due by 10/20/2015. Replies due by 10/27/2015. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 807 POST TRIAL ORDER RE: FORM OF JUDGMENT. Joint Statement filed by noon on 10/9/15. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/6/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 Exhibit Location (A-5):Plaintiff Jury Trial Exhibits: Exhibit #s PX3031, PX3039, PX3043, PX3044, PX3083, PX3119, PX3121, PX3142, PX3148, PX3164, PX3165, PX3166, PX3176, PX3188, PX3197, PX3200, PX3203, PX3204, PX3206, PX3225, PX3230, PX3233, PX3236, PX3238, PX3239, PX3249, PX3250, PX3256, PX3280, PX3285, PX3286, PX3291, PX3293, PX3303, PX3304, PX3311, PX3312, PX3333, PX3336, PX3343, PX3360, PX3374, PX3377, PX3400, PX3401, PX3412, PX3414, PX3442, PX3467, PX3488, PX3489, PX3491, PX3494, PX3497, PX3565, PX3658, PX3664, PX3722, PX3733, PX3735, PX3743, PX3744, PX3750, PX3751, PX3806, PX3817, PX3517, PX3518, PX3518-A, PX3520, PX3556, *3658, *3733, *3735, *3743, thumb drive Defendants' Jury Trial Exhibits:. Exhibit #s DX4000, DX4011, DX4016, DX4020, DX4021, DX4061, DX4068, DX4080, DX4200, DX4222, DX4224, DX4268, DX4272, DX4273, DX4274, DX4279, DX4337, DX4338, DX4339, DX4354, DX4363, DX4473, DX4606, DX5623, DX5623.1, DX5632, DX5674, DX5687, DX5688, DX5703, DX5704, DX5705, DX5706, DX5707, DX5716, DX5723, DX5760, DX5761, DX5765, DX5767, DX5771, DX5772, *DX5703 thru DX5707. Court Exhibit A, Transcript sent to jury *Physical Exhibits.(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015) Modified on 9/28/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2015 Filing 806 Jury Notes re Jury Trial (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 805 DEFENDANT FINAL Exhibit List for Jury Trial. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 804 PLAINTIFF FINAL Exhibit List for Jury Trial. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 803 JURY Trial Sheet and Witness and Exhibit List. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 802 RESPONSE (re #797 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Defendant Konstantino's Motion to Reopen Record, For Limited Discovery, and For Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert P. Feldman)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 801 Joint Statement re: Form of Judgment by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Judgment))(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 10/1/2015) Modified on 10/2/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2015 Filing 800 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 799 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 29, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #691 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 798 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 28, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #691 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 797 MOTION to Shorten Time re #785 Motion to Reopen Record, For Limited Discovery, and For Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 10/1/2015) Modified on 10/2/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Filing 796 NOTICE of Errata by Eitan Konstantino re #787 Request for Judicial Notice re #785 MOTION to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Filing 795 EXHIBITS re #786 Declaration in Support of Defendant Eitan Konstantino's Motion to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byEitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 Pt 1, #2 Exhibit 6 Pt 2, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #791 , #786 ) (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Filing 794 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 22, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order, #691 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Filing 793 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 21, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order, #691 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Electronic filing error. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4. Please re-file in its entirety with a title page Re: #791 Exhibits, filed by Eitan Konstantino (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 792 Joinder re #785 MOTION to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice filed by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Filing 791 EXHIBITS re #786 Declaration in Support, Motion to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice filed byEitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 Pt 2, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #786 ) (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 790 JURY VERDICT. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 789 Proposed Order re #785 MOTION to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice by Eitan Konstantino. (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Filing 788 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Deliberations held. Verdict.Jury Trial completed on 9/29/2015.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 787 Request for Judicial Notice re #785 MOTION to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice filed byEitan Konstantino. (Related document(s) #785 ) (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Filing 786 Declaration of Richard W. Buckner in Support of #785 MOTION Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice filed byEitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 10, #2 Exhibit 2 of 10, #3 Exhibit 3 of 10, #4 Exhibit 4 of 10, #5 Exhibit 5 of 10)(Related document(s) #785 ) (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Filing 785 MOTION to Reopen Trial Record, for Limited Discovery, and for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Request for Judicial Notice filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #783 Stipulation to Admit Exhibit (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 783 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMIT EXHIBIT filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc. Quattro Vasular PTE Ltd., QT Vascular Ltd., Eitan Konstantino. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2015 Filing 782 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT #794 *** Transcript of Proceedings held on September 22, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #732 Transcript Order, #734 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (Related documents(s) #732 , #734 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2015 Filing 781 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT #793 *** Transcript of Proceedings held on September 21, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporte Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #732 Transcript Order, #734 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (Related documents(s) #732 , #734 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2015 Filing 780 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/28/2015. Further Jury Deliberations set for Tuesday 9/29/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2015)
September 27, 2015 Filing 779 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Mary Pruetz as counsel of record for Defendant Eitan Konstantino (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/27/2015)
September 27, 2015 Filing 778 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard William Buckner as counsel of record for Defendant Eitan Konstantino (Buckner, Richard) (Filed on 9/27/2015)
September 27, 2015 Filing 777 NOTICE of Appearance by Mieke Katherine Malmberg as counsel of record for Defendant Eitan Konstantino (Malmberg, Mieke) (Filed on 9/27/2015)
September 27, 2015 Filing 776 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TRIAL TRANSCRIPT ERRATA by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/27/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2015 Filing 775 Response re #774 Request For Revised And Additional Final Jury Instructions byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 9/23/2015) Modified on 9/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2015 Filing 774 Request for Revised and Additional Final Jury Instructions by Angioscore, Inc. . (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/23/2015) Modified on 9/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2015 Filing 772 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 17, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order, #691 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/23/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Filing 773 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/22/2015.Further Jury Trial set for Monday, 9/28/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00AM.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 771 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 16, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order, #691 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/21/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2015 Filing 770 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/21/2015. Further Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 9/22/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00AM.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 769 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 15, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order, #691 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/18/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2015 Filing 768 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 14, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #689 Transcript Order, #691 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2015. (Related documents(s) #689 , #691 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/18/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2015 Filing 767 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/17/2015. Further Jury Trial set for MONDAY, 9/21/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 766 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law; Memorandum in Support of Motion For Judgment As A Matter of Law filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Responses due by 10/1/2015. Replies due by 10/8/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/17/2015) Modified on 9/18/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2015 Filing 765 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/16/2015.Further Jury Trial set for 9/17/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00AM.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 764 TRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on September 16, 2015. (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 16, 2015 Filing 763 STIPULATION Regarding Undisputed Facts filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/16/2015) Modified on 9/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2015 Filing 762 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/15/2015. Further Jury Trial set for Wednesday, 9/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00AM.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 761 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 9, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #732 Transcript Order, #734 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2015. (Related documents(s) #732 , #734 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/14/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2015: #1 Supplement Master Index) (oh, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 760 TRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on September 14, 2015. (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 759 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/14/2015 ; granting #752 Stipulation; granting #756 Stipulation; granting #757 Stipulation. Further Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 9/15/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00AM.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 758 ***ATTACHMENT INCORRECT. SEE DKT. NO. 759 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Trial held on 9/14/2015 ; granting #752 Stipulation; granting #756 Stipulation; granting #757 Stipulation. Further Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 9/15/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00AM.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2015 Filing 757 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Supplement Defendants' Trial Exhibit List re #724 Exhibit List filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., et al. (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/13/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2015 Filing 756 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT ANGIOSCORES TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (CORRECTED) filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/12/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2015 Filing 755 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT ANGIOSCORES TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/12/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 754 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO.7(PATENT CLAIMS) RE : DISCOVERY DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 753 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 (PATENT CLAIMS) RE: DISCOVERY DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 752 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW ADMITTED TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/10/2015) Modified on 9/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2015 Filing 751 AngioScore's Provision of Additional Evidence in Support of Designated Deposition Testimony of Momi Brosh by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/9/2015) Modified on 9/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2015 Filing 750 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Jury Selection held on 9/9/2015. Jury Trial set for Monday, 9/14/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel to be present at 8:00am.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 749 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 5 (PATENT CLAIMS) by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 748 Procedural Stipulations (Exhibit B to Pretrial Order) filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/4/2015) Modified on 9/8/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #745 REVISED Stipulation Permitting the use of Equipment in the Courtroom for Trial. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 746 RESPONSE to re #742 REQUEST FOR INTERIM JURY INSTRUCTION ON ISSUES RESOLVED BY SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 745 REVISED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING THE USE OF EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM FOR TRIAL filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/1/2015) Modified on 9/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2015 Filing 744 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PERMITTING THE USE OF EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM FOR TRIAL filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/31/2015) Modified on 9/1/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2015 Filing 743 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #732 Transcript Order, #734 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2015. (Related documents(s) #732 , #734 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 742 REQUEST FOR INTERIM JURY INSTRUCTION ON ISSUES RESOLVED BY SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caine, David) (Filed on 8/27/2015) Modified on 8/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 741 Defendants' Statement Regarding Length of Trial by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 8/27/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 740 Statement regarding Trial Scheduling by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #737 Stipulation regarding Additional Trial Stipulations (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 738 Proposed Order re #681 MOTION in Limine Omnibus (Revised) by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 737 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL TRIAL STIPULATIONS) filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/25/2015) Modified on 8/26/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 736 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 (PATENT CLAIMS) by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #682 Motion in Limine; denying #683 Motion in Limine; denying #684 Motion in Limine (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 735 (PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING REVISED DISCOVERY EXCERPTS by Trireme Medical, Inc., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/24/2015) Modified on 8/25/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Filing 734 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 22, 2015 Filing 733 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING ANGIOSCORE'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Caine, David) (Filed on 8/22/2015) Modified on 8/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2015 Filing 732 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 731 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Pretrial Conference held on 8/21/2015.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 730 Revised Joint List of Discovery Excerpts by Angioscore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix A)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #725 Stipulation regarding Motions in Limine. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 728 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 3 (PATENT CLAIMS) RE: DISCOVERY EXCERPTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/19/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 727 REVISED [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. 1-7) by Trireme Medical, Inc., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 726 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. 4, 5, & 6) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 725 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #723 Pretrial Order (REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. 4, 5, & 6) filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2015 Filing 724 Exhibit List (Defendants' Revised Trial Exhibit List) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc... (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 723 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 2(PATENT CLAIMS) RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/17/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 722 JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT FOR PATENT TRIAL by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/14/2015) Modified on 8/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2015 Filing 721 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery Excerpts by Trireme Medical, Inc., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Angioscore Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A & B, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37)(Caine, David) (Filed on 8/14/2015) Modified on 8/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2015 Filing 720 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 32 and 35 to the Joint List of Discovery Excerpts filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Fairneny, #2 Exhibit 32 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 32 (UNREDACTED), #4 Exhibit 35 (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit 35 (UNREDACTED), #6 Proposed Order)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 719 JOINT LIST OF DISCOVERY EXCERPTS by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/14/2015) Modified on 8/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #711 Stipulation Regarding Trial Stipulations. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 717 Exhibit List (Corrected Trial Exhibit List) by Angioscore, Inc... (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 715 Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 714 Exhibit List by Angioscore, Inc... (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 713 Exhibit List (DEFENDANTS' TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc... (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 712 CORRECTED JOINT TRIAL WITNESS LIST by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 711 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TRIAL STIPULATIONS filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 710 Witness List by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc (Joint Trial Witness List). (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 709 Proposed Form of Verdict by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form). (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 708 Proposed Joint Preliminary Statement of the Case by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 707 Proposed Form of Verdict by Angioscore, Inc. . (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 706 Joint Expert Witness List by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Caine, David) (Filed on 8/8/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2015 Filing 716 EXHIBIT A (CD) re #704 Declaration of Thomas T. Carmack in Support of Defendants oppositions to AngioScores Motions in Limine filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #704 ) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 705 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. RE DEFENDANTS NOTICE PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. 282 (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 704 DECLARATION of Thomas T. Carmack in Support of Opposition #701 Opposition/Response to Motion, #700 Opposition/Response to Motion, #682 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to State Law Claims, #702 Opposition/Response to Motion (Omnibus Declaration ISO Defendants' Oppositions to AngioScore's Omnibus Motions In Limine (Nos. 1 - 3) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #701 , #700 , #682 , #702 ) (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 8/7/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2015 Filing 703 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret H. Shyr (Shyr, Margaret) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 702 RESPONSE (re #681 MOTION in Limine Omnibus ) No. 3 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 701 RESPONSE (re #681 MOTION in Limine Omnibus ) No. 2 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 700 RESPONSE (re #681 MOTION in Limine Omnibus ) No. 1 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 699 Declaration of Laura L. Fairneny in Support of #694 Opposition/Response to Motion, #697 Opposition/Response to Motion, #696 Opposition/Response to Motion, #693 Opposition/Response to Motion, #698 Opposition/Response to Motion, #695 Opposition/Response to Motion, #692 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #694 , #697 , #696 , #693 , #698 , #695 , #692 ) (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 698 RESPONSE (re #687 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Evidence re Defendants' 510(k) Statements ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 697 RESPONSE (re #680 MIL No. 6 and Exhibit 8 to Declaration of T. Carmack ISO of Defendants MILs 1 through 7 ) Response to Defendants' MIL No. 6 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2015 Filing 696 RESPONSE (re #686 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Certain Testimony of Marc E. Levenston ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 695 RESPONSE (re #685 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Certain Testimony of Jeffrey Bleam ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 694 RESPONSE (re #684 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude AngioScore From Presenting Cumulative Expert Witness Testimony ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 693 RESPONSE (re #683 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude AngioScore's Willfulness Claim ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 692 RESPONSE (re #682 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to State Law Claims ) (Defendants' MIL No. 1) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 691 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 690 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Disston Hausman (Hausman, Claire) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 4, 2015 Filing 689 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 688 Declaration of Thomas T. Carmack in Support of #686 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Certain Testimony of Marc E. Levenston, #682 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to State Law Claims, #683 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude AngioScore's Willfulness Claim, #687 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Evidence re Defendants' 510(k) Statements, #685 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Certain Testimony of Jeffrey Bleam, #684 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude AngioScore From Presenting Cumulative Expert Witness Testimony, #680 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants MIL No. 6 and Exhibit 8 to Declaration of T. Carmack ISO of Defendants MILs 1 through 7 OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF THOMAS T. CARMACK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #686 , #682 , #683 , #687 , #685 , #684 , #680 ) (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 687 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Evidence re Defendants' 510(k) Statements filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 686 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Certain Testimony of Marc E. Levenston filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 685 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Certain Testimony of Jeffrey Bleam filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 684 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude AngioScore From Presenting Cumulative Expert Witness Testimony filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 683 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude AngioScore's Willfulness Claim filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 682 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to State Law Claims filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015) Modified on 8/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2015 Filing 681 MOTION in Limine Omnibus filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/7/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Fairneny, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Order)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 680 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants MIL No. 6 and Exhibit 8 to Declaration of T. Carmack ISO of Defendants MILs 1 through 7 filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nugyen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit REDACTED copy of Defendants MIL 6 to Preclude Horzewski Testimony, #4 Exhibit UNREDACTED copy of Defendants MIL 6 to Preclude Horzewski Testimony, #5 Exhibit REDACTED copy of Exhibit 8 to T. Carmack Decl, #6 Exhibit UNREDACTED copy of Exhibit 8 to T. Carmack Declaration)(Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 679 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (PATENT CLAIMS). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/30/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2015 Filing 678 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 22, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #674 Transcript Order, #675 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015. (Related documents(s) #674 , #675 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #673 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Filing 675 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 673 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to File Motions In Limine filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 7/23/2015) Modified on 7/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2015 Filing 677 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 7/22/2015.Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/22/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 672 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING AT EARLIER TIME OF 2:00PM ON WEDNESDAY, 7/22/2015.The Claim Construction Hearing in this case previously set for 3:00pm on 7/22/2015 will be held at the earlier time of 2:00pm on 7/22/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 671 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 5, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #655 Transcript Order, #656 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 09/28/2015. (Related document(s) #655 , #656 ) (rhm) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing re 672 Clerk's Notice, Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22/2015 02:00 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 670 Joint Statement re: Form of Judgment by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Judgment)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 669 Responsive Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #663 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 668 REPLY to #660 Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Angioscore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Fairneny, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #660 ) (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #597 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to James Geriak. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #596 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Andre De La Cruz. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 665 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Joint Statement filed by 7/13/15. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/1/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 664 CLERK'S NOTICE: Dkt. No. 632, Order Regarding Scheduling for Patent Trial: Page 2, line 22 should read: with respect to any further motion in limine practice, such motions shall be filed on FRIDAY, July 24, 2015.... (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 663 AngioScore's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Fairneny, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 6/18/2015) Modified on 6/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2015 Filing 662 EXHIBITS re #660 Supplemental Brief,,, Exhibits to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 10 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 11 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 12 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 13 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief)(Related document(s) #660 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 6/18/2015) Modified on 6/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2015 Filing 661 EXHIBITS re #660 Supplemental Brief,,, Exhibits to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 6 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 7 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 8 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 9 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief)(Related document(s) #660 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 660 Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Caine in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 to David A. Caine's Declaration, #3 Declaration of Neil Sheehan in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 1 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 2 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 3 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration, #7 Exhibit 1 Part 4 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration, #8 Exhibit 1 Part 5 to Neil Sheehan's Declaration) (Caine, David) (Filed on 6/18/2015) Modified on 6/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2015 Filing 659 Defendants' Response to #657 Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #657 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 6/18/2015) Modified on 6/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2015 Filing 658 Supplemental Post-Trial Brief filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2015) Modified on 6/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 656 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 655 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 654 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2015. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney David Steuer. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #648 Stipulation Regarding Trial Date (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #647 Motion to Withdraw Brandon Baum as Attorney. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 27, 2015 Filing 651 Responses to re #643 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 5/27/2015) Modified on 5/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2015 Filing 650 POST-TRIAL REPLY BRIEF by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 5/27/2015) Modified on 5/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2015 Filing 649 REPLY POST-TRIAL BRIEF by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 AngioScore's Response to Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 5/27/2015) Modified on 5/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2015 Filing 648 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Trial Date filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 5/22/2015) Modified on 5/26/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2015 Filing 647 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF BRANDON BAUM AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR TRIREME MEDICAL, LLC, EITAN KONSTANTINO, QUATTRO VASCULAR PTE LTD., and QT VASCULAR LTD., AND (PROPOSED) ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 5/14/2015) Modified on 5/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER RE JOINT STATEMENT[DKT. NO. 640] [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/14/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing re #646 Order Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22/2015 03:00 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 645 POST TRIAL BRIEF by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 5/13/2015) Modified on 5/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2015 Filing 644 Proposed Findings of Fact by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. and Conclusions of Law. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 643 POST TRIAL BRIEF by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 AngioScore's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2015) Modified on 5/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2015 Filing 642 Proposed Order re #640 Statement by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 641 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, MAY 15, 2015 AT 9:01 AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 8, 2015 Filing 640 Joint Statement filed pursuant to Court's Order regarding schedule for patent trial by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 5/8/2015) Modified on 5/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #634 Motion to Admit Exhibits Identified in Deposition Designations Played at Trial. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 5, 2015 Filing 638 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 21, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #554 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #550 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2015. (Related document(s) #554 , #550 ) (rhm) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 5, 2015 Filing 637 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 20, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #554 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #550 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2015. (Related document(s) #554 , #550 ) (rhm) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 636 Reduction of Asserted Claims by Angioscore, Inc. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Filing 635 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #634 MOTION to Admit Exhibits Identified in Deposition Designations Played at Trial filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #634 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Filing 634 Unopposed Administrative MOTION to Admit Exhibits Identified in Deposition Designations Played at Trial; Notice of Trial Exhibits Corresponding to Deposition Exhibit Numbers filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. Responses due by 5/15/2015. Replies due by 5/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Admit Exhibits Identified in Deposition Designations Played at Trial)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR PATENT TRIAL. Jury Selection set for 9/9/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 7 Day Jury Trial(Evidence Portion) set for 9/14/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER RE EVIDENTIARY RULING; PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW FORMAT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 627 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Adam Caine (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM FOR JAMES C. OTTESON, DAVID A. CAINE, THOMAS T. CARMACK & MICHAEL NGUYEN) (Caine, David) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 625 NOTICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Lodging (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 Exhibit Location (B4-6). Plaintiff's Bench Trial Exhibit #s: 1-3, 6-8, 11, 15, 17-19, 29, 30, 32, 33, 40, 43, 45, 63-67, 69, 70, 72-74, 76, 78, 80, 81, 85, 87, 89-93, 96, 98, 101, 103, 104, 107, 109, 124-127, 130, 132, 135-137, 142, 143, 152, 154, 158, 164, 174, 189, 195-197, 201, 207, 211, 212, 214, 217, 220, 222, 223, 226, 228, 229, 234, 240-242, 244, 246, 254-258, 260, 264, 265, 281, 289, 291, 294, 295, 312, 320, 326, 328, 336, 340, 345, 351, 356, 357 (5 binders), 358 (3 binders), 359 (2 binders), 360 (3 binders), 361-376, 380, 381, 383, 385, 388, 394, 420-423, 427, 428, 431-433, 435-440, 442, 444, 445, 450, 452, 456-460, 478, 501, 530, 531, 533, 540, 546, 547, 584, 585, 587, 594-596, 599, 600, 602-604, 607-610, 617-623, 625, 629, 630.Plaintiff's Bench Trial *PHYSICAL Exhibit #s: *456, (450, 452, 596 - photo copy).Defendants' Bench Trial Exhibit #s: 1005, 1006, 1009, 1014, 1016, 1020, 1031, 1032, 1034, 1035, 1038, 1055, 1099, 1102, 1140, 1144, 1146, 1157, 1165, 1175, 1182, 1186, 1199, 1205, 1211, 1219, 1220, 1238, 1239, 1257, 1268, 1278, 1279, 1282, 1283, 1285, 1286, 1288, 1289, 1292, 1295, 1298, 1309, 1311, 1312, 1317, 1318, 1324, 1329, 1334, 1338, 1353, 1361, 1369, 1371, 1435, 1442, 1465, 1485, 1498, 1499, 1580-1582, 1599, 1608, 1609, 1622, 1628, 1636, 1640, 1653, 1657, 1690, 1698, 1704, 1706, 1711, 1745, 1765, 1770-1772, 1804, 1811-A, 1816, 1842, 1851, 1857, 1860, *1977, 1984-1986, 1993, 1997, 2010, 2012-2019, 2024-2026 Defendants' Bench Trial PHYSICAL Exhibit #s: *1977, 2002 & 2003 (thumb drive), 2027, 2028 (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015) Modified on 5/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/28/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2015 Filing 633 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/21/2015. CLOSINGS for Jury Trial are set for Monday, 9/28/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 5/15/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing by 5/8/15. See minutes as to other dates set.Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Laura Fairneny. Defendant Attorney David Caine. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 630 DEFENDANTS FINAL TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST FOR BENCH TRIAL. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 629 PLAINTIFF FINAL TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST FOR BENCH TRIAL: Part One: Exhibits 1-304 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Part Two: Exhibits 305-630)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 628 Trial Sheet for BENCH TRIAL. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 626 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial completed on 4/21/2015.Proposed Findings of Fact filed by 5/13/15.Simultaneous filing of Opening Briefs of 30 pages filed by 5/13/13; Simultaneous filing of Reply Briefs of 15 pages filed by 5/27/15. Hearing set for Friday, 6/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 624 NOTICE of Trial Exhibits Corresponding to Deposition Exhibit Numbers Used in AngioScore's Deposition Designations and Defendants Counter Designations by Angioscore, Inc. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/21/2015) Modified on 4/22/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2015 Filing 623 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 16, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #554 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #550 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (Related document(s) #554 , #550 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 622 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 15, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #554 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #550 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (Related document(s) #554 , #550 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 621 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 4/20/2015. Further Bench Trial set for Tuesday, 4/21/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Bob Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 620 Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc... (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/20/2015) Modified on 4/21/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2015 Filing 619 Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by Angioscore, Inc... (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/19/2015) Modified on 4/20/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2015 Filing 618 JOINT LETTER REGARDING SUBMISSION RE TESTIMONY OF R. FARWELL . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/19/2015) Modified on 4/20/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2015 Filing 617 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 14, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #554 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #550 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2015. (Related document(s) #554 , #550 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 616 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 13, 2015 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #554 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #550 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2015. (Related document(s) #554 , #550 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/17/2015) Modified on 4/20/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2015: #1 Supplement Master Index) (oh, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2015 Filing 615 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Bench Trial held on 4/16/2015. Bench Trial set for MONDAY, 4/20/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 614 Defendants' First Amended Trial Exhibit List by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc... (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/15/2015) Modified on 4/16/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2015 Filing 613 Exhibit List First Amended by Angioscore, Inc... (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 612 [Corrected] Defendants' Submission Re: Order on Plaintiff's First Motion In Limine (Dkt. No. 606) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/15/2015) Modified on 4/16/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2015 Filing 611 Submission Re: #606 Order on Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/15/2015) Modified on 4/16/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2015 Filing 610 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Bench Trial held on 4/15/2015. Bench Trial set for Thursday, 4/16/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter :Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 609 Exhibit List Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc... (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 608 AMENDED Witness List by Angioscore, Inc. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/14/2015) Modified on 4/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2015 Filing 607 Witness List by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. . (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #593 Motion in Limine (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 605 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Bench Trial held on 4/14/2015. Bench Trial set for Wednesday, 4/15/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter :Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 604 Witness List by Angioscore, Inc. ANGIOSCORE'S WITNESS LIST. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 603 Exhibit List ANGIOSCORE'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Angioscore, Inc... (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 602 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #601 Opposition/Response to Motion to Admit Certain Documents filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #601 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 601 RESPONSE (re #594 Second MOTION in Limine TO ADMIT CERTAIN DOCUMENTS ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 600 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #599 Opposition/Response to Motion in Limine to Preclude Defense Witness Randal Farwell filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #599 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 599 RESPONSE (re #593 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE WITNESS RANDAL FARWELL ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 598 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 4/13/2015. Further Bench Trial set for Tuesday, 4/14/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 597 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of James Geriak as Counsel of Record for AngioScore, Inc. and Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal by Angioscore, Inc. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 596 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Andre De La Cruz as Counsel of Record for AngioScore, Inc. and Proposed Order by Angioscore, Inc. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2015 Filing 595 Declaration of ROBERT P. FELDMAN CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [594-1] filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 9, 2015 Filing 594 Second MOTION in Limine TO ADMIT CERTAIN DOCUMENTS filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/13/2015. Replies due by 4/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exh A, #3 Exhibit Exh 1 (Part 1) to Exh A, #4 Exhibit Exh 1 (Part 2) to Exh A, #5 Exhibit Exh 1 (Part 3) to Exh A, #6 Exhibit Exh 2 (Part 1) to Exh A, #7 Exhibit Exh 2 (Part 2) to Exh A, #8 Exhibit Exh 2 (Part 3) to Exh A, #9 Exhibit Exh 3 to Exh A, #10 Exhibit Exh 4 to Exh A, #11 Exhibit Exh 5 to Exh A, #12 Exhibit Exh 6 to Exh A, #13 Exhibit Exh 7 to Exh A, #14 Exhibit Exh 8 to Exh A, #15 Exhibit Exh 9 to Exh A, #16 Exhibit Exh 10 to Exh A, #17 Exhibit Exh 11 to Exh A, #18 Exhibit Exh 12 to Exh A, #19 Exhibit Exh 13 to Exh A, #20 Exhibit Exh 14 to Exh A, #21 Exhibit Exh 15 to Exh A, #22 Exhibit Exh 16 to Exh A, #23 Exhibit Exh 19 to Exh A)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 593 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE WITNESS RANDAL FARWELL filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/13/2015. Replies due by 4/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exh 1, #3 Exhibit Exh 2, #4 Exhibit Exh 3, #5 Exhibit Exh 4, #6 Exhibit Exh 5, #7 Exhibit Exh 6, #8 Exhibit Exh 7, #9 Exhibit Exh 8)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/8/2015) Modified on 4/9/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #590 Corrected Motion to Bring Equipment in for Bench Trial (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER by Judge Gonzalez Rogers denying #462 Motion in Limine; denying #463 Motion in Limine; granting #466 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #468 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #478 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #555 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #575 Motion to Stay; denying #576 Motion to Shorten Time (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 590 CORRECTED MOTION and (Proposed) Order to Permit Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Responses due by 4/20/2015. Replies due by 4/27/2015. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/6/2015) Modified on 4/7/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2015 Filing 589 MOTION for Order to Permit Equipment in the Courtroom filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Responses due by 4/20/2015. Replies due by 4/27/2015. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/6/2015) Modified on 4/7/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit: The motion for a stay and petition for a writ of mandamus are denied as to #571 USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 15-128 (re petition for writ of mandamus). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 587 RESPONSE (re #575 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pending in the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re #573 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2015) Modified on 4/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2015 Filing 586 Supplemental Declaration of Dylan J. Liddiard in Support of Defendants' #555 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #555 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/1/2015) Modified on 4/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2015 Filing 585 REPLY (re #555 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/1/2015) Modified on 4/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2015 Filing 584 RESPONSE to re #583 Order Requiring Statement by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER Requiring Statement. Signed by Judge Gonzalez Rogers on 3/31/2015. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 582 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 3, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #545 Transcript Order, #546 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (Related document(s) #545 , #546 ) (rhm) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 581 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 3/27/2015. Case did not settle. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney: Dylan Liddiard. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 580 RESPONSE (re #576 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Stay #575 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2015) Modified on 3/27/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Filing 579 DECLARATION of Margret Caruso In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 578 RESPONSE (re #555 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 577 Declaration of Dylan J. Liddiard in Support of #576 MOTION to Shorten Time , #575 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pending in the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re #573 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #576 , #575 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Filing 576 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Stay #575 filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Order Shortening Time)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Filing 575 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pending in the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re #573 filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/8/2015. Replies due by 4/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Stay Action Pending Resolution of Defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pending in the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing: Telephone Settlement Conference set for 3/27/2015 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 574 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 3/24/2015. Further telephone settlement set for March 27, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. (Not Reported).Plaintiff Attorneys: Diane Doolittle; Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney: Dylan Liddiard. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #571 petition for a writ of mandamus (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 23, 2015 Filing 572 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 3/23/2015. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney: Dylan Liddiard. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2015)
March 23, 2015 Filing 571 USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 15-128 (re petition for writ of mandamus). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015) Modified on 3/23/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL TIME LIMITS AND PREPARATION OF MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/20/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #556 Motion to Shorten Time (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 568 Supplemental Brief re #555 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #555 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 567 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 3/16/2015. Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement conference statements shall be LODGED with chambers and emailed to JSCPO@cand.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. on March 20, 2015.Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney: Dylan Liddiard. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Wolitz (Wolitz, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #562 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Catherine Grealis representing Defendants. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for Settlement. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/13/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 563 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to the Courts oral order at the March 3, 2015 hearing. filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, et al. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 3/13/2015) Modified on 3/13/2015 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2015 Filing 562 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Catherine Grealis ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9356392.) filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Grealis, Catherine) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 561 NOTICE of Appearance by Cali D Tran (Tran, Cali) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 560 NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Gowoon Kim (Kim, Joy) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 559 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Simons Aufhauser (Aufhauser, Anne) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 558 RESPONSE (re #556 MOTION to Shorten Time re #555 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 3/12/2015) Modified on 3/12/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2015 Filing 557 Declaration of Dylan J. Liddiard in Support of #556 MOTION to Shorten Time re #555 , #555 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #556 , #555 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/11/2015) Modified on 3/12/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2015 Filing 556 MOTION to Shorten Time re #555 filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Order Shortening Time)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 555 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 3/25/2015. Replies due by 4/1/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. P. 12(b)(1))(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/11/2015) Modified on 3/12/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2015 Filing 554 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance by Cali D Tran (Tran, Cali) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Gowoon Kim (Kim, Joy) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 551 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine M. Owens (Owens, Jasmine) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 550 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Angioscore, Inc.. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 548 Supplemental Brief re #511 Opposition/Response to Motion re Patent Damages filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #511 ) (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 547 Supplemental Brief re #471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Gary Olsen (Patent Damages) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #471 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 546 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 549 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing and OSC Hearing #542 held on 3/3/2015 re #478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Angioscore, Inc., #464 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan filed by Angioscore, Inc., #466 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Professor David Lewin filed by Angioscore, Inc., #463 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Gary Olsen re State Law Damages filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #462 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinions and Testimony from Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Eric L. Talley Under Daubert filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., #471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Feldman. Defendant Attorney Dylan Liddiard. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 544 Declaration of Peter J. Armenio to the Court's Order to Show Cause Dkt. #542 by Angioscore, Inc. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 3/2/2015) Modified on 3/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2015 Filing 543 Declaration of Thomas Martin in Response to Order to Show Cause #542 Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Martin, Thomas) (Filed on 3/2/2015). Modified on 3/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Tuesday, 3/3/2015 09:00 AM. Plaintiff declaration filed no later than Monday, 3/2/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/26/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 541 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 540 OBJECTIONS to re #532 Reply in Support of its Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 2/11/2015) Modified on 2/12/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTIONS ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MOTIONS IN LIMINE; ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING Set/Reset Deadlines as to #464 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan, #462 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinions and Testimony from Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Eric L. Talley Under Daubert, #463 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Gary Olsen re State Law Damages, #466 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Professor David Lewin, #471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN, #478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 is CONTINUED one week to 3/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The Compliance hearing set for 2/13/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 538 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #537 Exhibits,,, #536 Declaration in Support,,, Re Exhibits 87, 131 (Notices of Manual Filing) to Supplemental Danitz Declaration ISO Defs.' Motion for Summary Judgment re State Law Claims (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 537 EXHIBITS 106 Through 131 to re #536 Supplemental Declaration of Brian Danitz ISO Defs.' Motion for Summary Judgment re State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 106, #2 Exhibit 107, #3 Exhibit 108, #4 Exhibit 109, #5 Exhibit 110, #6 Exhibit 111, #7 Exhibit 112, #8 Exhibit 113, #9 Exhibit 114, #10 Exhibit 115, #11 Exhibit 116, #12 Exhibit 117, #13 Exhibit 118, #14 Exhibit 119, #15 Exhibit 120, #16 Exhibit 121, #17 Exhibit 122, #18 Exhibit 123, #19 Exhibit 124, #20 Exhibit 125, #21 Exhibit 126 Part 1 of 2, #22 Exhibit 126 Part 2 of 2, #23 Exhibit 127, #24 Exhibit 128, #25 Exhibit 129, #26 Exhibit 130, #27 Exhibit 131)(Related document(s) #536 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Filing 536 Supplemental Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #468 Motion for Summary Judgment re State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 78, #2 Exhibit 79, #3 Exhibit 80, #4 Exhibit 81, #5 Exhibit 82, #6 Exhibit 83, #7 Exhibit 84, #8 Exhibit 85, #9 Exhibit 86, #10 Exhibit 87, #11 Exhibit 88, #12 Exhibit 89, #13 Exhibit 90, #14 Exhibit 91, #15 Exhibit 92, #16 Exhibit 93, #17 Exhibit 94, #18 Exhibit 95, #19 Exhibit 96, #20 Exhibit 97, #21 Exhibit 98, #22 Exhibit 99, #23 Exhibit 100, #24 Exhibit 101, #25 Exhibit 102, #26 Exhibit 103, #27 Exhibit 104, #28 Exhibit 105)(Related document(s) #535 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Filing 535 REPLY (re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reply to AngioScore, Inc.'s Response to Defendants' Separate Statement in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Filing 534 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #533 Reply to Opposition/Response to AngioScore's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #533 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 533 REPLY (re #478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 AngioScore's Response to Defendants' Objections)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 532 REPLY (re #464 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 531 REPLY (re #463 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Gary Olsen re State Law Damages ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Filing 530 REPLY (re #471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Caine, #2 Exhibit A)(Caine, David) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 529 REPLY (re #466 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Professor David Lewin ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 528 REPLY (re #462 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinions and Testimony from Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Eric L. Talley Under Daubert ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Filing 527 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by James W. Geriak (Geriak, James) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 526 Transcript of FTR Proceedings held on January 9, 2015, 1:36 - 2:28, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #457 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2015. (Related documents(s) #457 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #364 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Daniel Robson representing Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 524 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reset The Compliance Hearing Date filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Caine, David) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2015 Filing 523 EXHIBIT 32 (DVD) to #500 Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #504 -2 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #504 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 522 Corrected EXHIBIT 2 re #503 Declaration in Support,, of AngioScore's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Gary Olsen Re State Law Damages (CORRECTION OF #[503-2] AND #519 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #503 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Filing 521 EXHIBITS 31-45 re #516 Declaration in Support,, of AngioScore's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (CORRECTION OF #518 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 44, #15 Exhibit 45)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Filing 520 EXHIBITS 16-30 re #516 Declaration in Support,, of AngioScore's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (CORRECTION OF #517 ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27 Part 1, #13 Exhibit 27 Part 2, #14 Exhibit 27 Part 3, #15 Exhibit 28, #16 Exhibit 29, #17 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Filing 519 ***NO TITLE PAGE, SEE DOCUMENT #522 *** EXHIBITS re #503 Declaration in Support,, CORRECTION OF DOCKET [503-2] filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #503 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Electronic filing error. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4. Please re-file in its entirety with a title page Re: #518 Exhibits, filed by Angioscore, Inc., #519 Exhibits filed by Angioscore, Inc., #517 Exhibits, filed by Angioscore, Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 31, 2015 Filing 518 ***NO TITLE PAGE, SEE DOCUMENT #521 *** EXHIBITS re #516 Declaration in Support,, filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 44, #15 Exhibit 45)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/31/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2015 Filing 517 ***NO TITLE PAGE, SEE DOCUMENT #520 *** EXHIBITS re #516 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 16-30 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27A, #13 Exhibit 27B, #14 Exhibit 27C, #15 Exhibit 28, #16 Exhibit 29, #17 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/31/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2015 Filing 516 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #512 Opposition/Response to Motion, Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6A, #7 Exhibit 6B, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #512 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/31/2015)
January 31, 2015 Filing 515 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angioscore, Inc. re #514 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AngioScore's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinion of Gary Olen (Dkts. #511 ) and Exhibit 12 of the Supporting Declaration #513 (Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 1/31/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 514 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AngioScore's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinion of Gary Olen (Dkts. #511 ) and Exhibit 12 of the Supporting Declaration #513 filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Nguyen ISO of AngioScore's Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B (Redacted), #4 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit C (Redacted, #6 Exhibit C (Unredacted))(Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 513 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #511 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) #511 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 512 RESPONSE (re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 AngioScore's Response to Defendants' Separate of Undisputed Facts)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 511 RESPONSE (re #471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 510 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #504 Exhibits,,,, Re Exhibit 32 (Notice of Manual Filing) to Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 509 Exhibits 101 Through 134 to #500 Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #498 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 103, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107, #8 Exhibit 108, #9 Exhibit 109, #10 Exhibit 110, #11 Exhibit 111, #12 Exhibit 112, #13 Exhibit 113, #14 Exhibit 114, #15 Exhibit 115, #16 Exhibit 116, #17 Exhibit 117, #18 Exhibit 118, #19 Exhibit 119, #20 Exhibit 120 Part 1 of 3, #21 Exhibit 120 Part 2 of 3, #22 Exhibit 120 Part 3 of 3, #23 Exhibit 121, #24 Exhibit 122, #25 Exhibit 123, #26 Exhibit 124, #27 Exhibit 125, #28 Exhibit 126, #29 Exhibit 127, #30 Exhibit 128, #31 Exhibit 129, #32 Exhibit 130, #33 Exhibit 131, #34 Exhibit 132, #35 Exhibit 133, #36 Exhibit 134)(Related document(s) #498 , #500 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 508 Exhibits 81 Through 100 to #500 Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #498 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81, #2 Exhibit 82, #3 Exhibit 83, #4 Exhibit 84, #5 Exhibit 85, #6 Exhibit 86, #7 Exhibit 87, #8 Exhibit 88, #9 Exhibit 89, #10 Exhibit 90, #11 Exhibit 91, #12 Exhibit 92, #13 Exhibit 93, #14 Exhibit 94, #15 Exhibit 95, #16 Exhibit 96, #17 Exhibit 97, #18 Exhibit 98, #19 Exhibit 99, #20 Exhibit 100)(Related document(s) #498 , #500 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 507 Exhibits 61 Through 80 to #500 Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #498 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67 Part 1 of 2, #8 Exhibit 67 Part 2 of 2, #9 Exhibit 68, #10 Exhibit 69, #11 Exhibit 70, #12 Exhibit 71, #13 Exhibit 72, #14 Exhibit 73, #15 Exhibit 74, #16 Exhibit 75, #17 Exhibit 76, #18 Exhibit 77, #19 Exhibit 78, #20 Exhibit 79, #21 Exhibit 80 Part 1 of 3, #22 Exhibit 80 Part 2 of 3, #23 Exhibit 80 part 3 of 3)(Related document(s) #498 , #500 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 506 Declaration of Suong Nguyen in Support of #505 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #505 ) (Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 505 RESPONSE (re #462 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinions and Testimony from Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Eric L. Talley Under Daubert ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 504 Exhibits 31 Through 60 to #500 Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #498 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32 - Notice of Manual Filing, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35 Part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit 35 Part 2 of 2, #7 Exhibit 36, #8 Exhibit 37, #9 Exhibit 38, #10 Exhibit 39, #11 Exhibit 40, #12 Exhibit 41, #13 Exhibit 42, #14 Exhibit 43, #15 Exhibit 44, #16 Exhibit 45, #17 Exhibit 46, #18 Exhibit 47, #19 Exhibit 48, #20 Exhibit 49, #21 Exhibit 50, #22 Exhibit 51, #23 Exhibit 52, #24 Exhibit 53, #25 Exhibit 54, #26 Exhibit 55, #27 Exhibit 56, #28 Exhibit 57, #29 Exhibit 58, #30 Exhibit 59, #31 Exhibit 60)(Related document(s) #498 , #500 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 503 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #499 Opposition/Response to Motion, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #501 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2,***SEE DOCUMENT #522 *** #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) #499 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 502 Exhibits 11 Through 30 to #500 Danitz Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to AS Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #498 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15 Part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit 15 Part 2 of 2, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19 Part 1 of 2, #11 Exhibit 19 Part 2 of 2, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit 22, #15 Exhibit 23, #16 Exhibit 24, #17 Exhibit 25, #18 Exhibit 26, #19 Exhibit 27, #20 Exhibit 28, #21 Exhibit 29, #22 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #498 , #500 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 501 ***SEE DOCUMENT #503 *** Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #499 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) #499 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 500 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #498 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Defendants' Opposition to AngioScore's Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 1 of 5, #7 Exhibit 4 Part 2 of 5, #8 Exhibit 4 Part 3 of 5, #9 Exhibit 4 Part 4 of 5, #10 Exhibit 4 Part 5 of 5, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7 Part 1 of 2, #14 Exhibit 7 Part 2 of 2, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #498 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 499 RESPONSE (re #463 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Gary Olsen re State Law Damages ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 498 RESPONSE (re #478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) Defendants' Opposition to AngioScore, Inc.'s Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to AS Sep Statement ISO Mot for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Defendants' Objections to Evidence Submitted by Pl AS ISO Its Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 497 RESPONSE (re #466 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Professor David Lewin ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 496 RESPONSE (re #464 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Caine, David) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 495 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to #471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Caine, David) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 494 ERRATA re #478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - AngioScore, Inc.'s Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 493 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2014, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 2:02 p.m. - 2:14 p.m. = 12 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 492 NOTICE OF ERRATA re Defendant's Separate Statement ISO MSJ on State Law Claims re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Defs' Corrected Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts ISO MSJ on State Law Claims)(Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/16/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Filing 491 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen in Response to Court Order re Sealing of Documents (Dkt. No. #453 by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Filing 490 Declaration of Thomas T. Carmack in Response to Court Order re Sealing of Documents (Dkt. No. #453 ) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/16/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Filing 489 Declaration of Brandon Baum in Response to Court Order re Sealing of Documents re #453 Order by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Filing 488 Declaration of David A. Caine in Response to Court Order re Sealing of Documents (Dkt. No. 453) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Filing 487 DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. HANLE re #453 Order by Angioscore, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Filing 486 Declaration of Andre' De La Cruz re #453 Order by Angioscore, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Electronic filing error: Re: #480 Exhibits, #481 Exhibits, #482 Exhibits, #483 Exhibits, #484 , Exhibits, 485] Exhibits, filed by Angioscore, Inc. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4. No further action is necessary at this time. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 485 EXHIBITS 61-70 re #479 Declaration in Support, of AngioScore Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dkt. #478 , filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67, #8 Exhibit 68, #9 Exhibit 69, #10 Exhibit 70)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 484 EXHIBITS 51-60 re #479 Declaration in Support, of AngioScore Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dkt. #478 , filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 483 EXHIBITS 41-50 re #479 Declaration in Support, of AngioScore Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dkt. #478 , filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 482 EXHIBITS 31-40 re #479 Declaration in Support, of AngioScore Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dkt. #478 , filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 481 EXHIBITS 21-30 re #479 Declaration in Support, of AngioScore Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dkt. #478 , filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 480 EXHIBITS 11-20 re #479 Declaration in Support, of AngioScore Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Dkt. 478] filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 19, #10 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 479 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8A, #9 Exhibit 8B, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #478 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 478 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Separate Statement fo Undisputed Facts, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 477 EXHIBITS 72 to 77 to re #469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 72, #2 Exhibit 73, #3 Exhibit 74, #4 Exhibit 75, #5 Exhibit 76, #6 Exhibit 77)(Related document(s) #469 , #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 476 EXHIBIT 71 to re #469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 71 Part 1 of 8, #2 Exhibit 71 Part 2 of 8, #3 Exhibit 71 Part 3 of 8, #4 Exhibit 71 Part 4 of 8, #5 Exhibit 71 Part 5 of 8, #6 Exhibit 71 Part 6 of 8, #7 Exhibit 71 Part 7 of 8, #8 Exhibit 71 Part 8 of 8)(Related document(s) #469 , #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 475 EXHIBITS 61 to 70 to re #469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67, #8 Exhibit 68, #9 Exhibit 69, #10 Exhibit 70)(Related document(s) #469 , #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 474 EXHIBITS 54 to 60 to re #469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54, #2 Exhibit 55, #3 Exhibit 56, #4 Exhibit 57, #5 Exhibit 58, #6 Exhibit 59, #7 Exhibit 60)(Related document(s) #469 , #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 473 EXHIBITS 51 to 53 to re #469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 51 Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53 Part 1 of 5, #5 Exhibit 53 Part 2 of 5, #6 Exhibit 53 Part 3 of 5, #7 Exhibit 53 Part 4 of 5, #8 Exhibit 53 Part 5 of 5)(Related document(s) #469 , #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 472 EXHIBITS 21 to 50 to re #469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in support of re #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 38, #19 Exhibit 39, #20 Exhibit 40, #21 Exhibit 41, #22 Exhibit 42, #23 Exhibit 43 part 1 of 2, #24 Exhibit 43 Part 2 of 2, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 48, #30 Exhibit 49, #31 Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) #469 , #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 471 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF GARY OLSEN filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/28/2015. Replies due by 2/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Caine, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Order)(Caine, David) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gary Olsen and Exhibits filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gary Olsen, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Caine, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Declaration of David Caine, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gary Olsen, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Caine, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Declaration of David Caine, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Declaration of David Caine, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Declaration of David Caine)(Caine, David) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 469 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7a, #9 Exhibit 7b, #10 Exhibit 7c, #11 Exhibit 7d, #12 Exhibit 7e, #13 Exhibit 7f, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) #468 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 468 MOTION for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts ISO MSJ on State Law Claims, #2 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 467 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #466 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Professor David Lewin filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #466 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 466 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Professor David Lewin filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 465 Declaration of Kimball Dean Parker in Support of #464 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #464 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 464 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions of Neil Sheehan filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 463 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Gary Olsen re State Law Damages filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Marquez ISO Defs.' Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to E. Marquez' Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to E. Marquez' Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to E. Marquez' Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to E. Marquez' Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2015 Filing 462 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinions and Testimony from Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Eric L. Talley Under Daubert filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Turbow ISO Defs.' Motion, #2 Exhibit A to D. Turbow's Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to D. Turbow's Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/15/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Filing 461 EXHIBITS Exh C - Unsealed Per Court Order of 1/6/15 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 13, 2015 Filing 460 ***DOCUMENT BLOCKED PER CHAMBERS REQUEST*** EXHIBITS Exh A - Unsealed Per Court Order of 1/6/15 filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 1/13/2015) Modified on 1/14/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Filing 459 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 456 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing re: privilege log & deposition of Tom Trotter held on 1/9/2015. FTR Time 1:36-2:28. Plaintiff Attorneys: Margaret Caruso; Kimball Parker; Diane Doolittle*; Rachel Kassabian*. Defendant Attorneys: David Caine; Brian Danitz; Steven Guggenheim; Dylan Liddiard*. *Telephone AppearanceThis is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER re #452 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Expert Reports of Gary Gershony, M.D., Rajendra Cornelius, & Michael Horzewski filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT re #447 Letter Brief, filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER (1)GRANTING AND GRANTING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL; (2) DENYING MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; (3)SETTING FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR DOCUMENTS CONTAINING DESIGNATED MATERIAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting in part and denying in part #343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #346 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; granting in part and denying in part #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #354 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; granting #365 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; granting in part and denying in part #393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 452 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Expert Reports of Gary Gershony, M.D., Rajendra Cornelius, & Michael Horzewski filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caine, David) (Filed on 1/5/2015) Modified on 1/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2015 Filing 451 Declaration of Suong Nguyen in Support of #445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #445 ) (Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 2, 2015 Filing 450 Declaration of Thomas Trotter in Support of #445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #445 ) (Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 2, 2015 Filing 449 Letter Brief re #447 Letter Brief, in Opposition to Defendants' Request to File Summary Judgment Motion of Non-Infringement of '119 Patent filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #447 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER RE: DISPUTES RE: PLAINTIFF'S PRIVILEGE LOG. Discovery Hearing set for 1/9/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/2/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
December 29, 2014 Filing 447 Letter Brief Requesting Leave of Court to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 12/29/2014) Modified on 12/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2014 Filing 446 Letter Brief Responding to Plaintiff's Ltr Brf Re Remaining Priv Log Disputes filed byEitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 29, 2014 Filing 445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edmundo Marquez ISO Defs Admn Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Defs Ltr Brief Responding to Pltffs Ltr Brief Re Priv Log Disputes (Public Redacted), #4 Exhibit Defs Ltr Brief Responding to Pltffs Ltr Brief Re Priv Log Disputes (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit A to Defs Ltr Brief (Public Redacted), #6 Exhibit A to Defs Ltr Brief (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit B to Defs Ltr Brief (Public Redacted), #8 Exhibit B to Defs Ltr Brief (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit D to Defs Ltr Brief (Public Redacted), #10 Exhibit D to Defs Ltr Brief (Under Seal), #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 29, 2014 Filing 444 Letter from AngioScore, Inc. LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE ADDRESSED IN Dkt 433. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 443 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 12/15/14, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 9:03 - 10:13. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #429 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2015. (Related documents(s) #429 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 442 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/18/2014. Defendant's Motion to Compel Gary Olsen's deposition (Dkt. No. #437 ) is granted. Mr. Olsen's deposition shall take place on December 23, 2014 for 3.5 hours. FTR Time 2:02-2:14. Plaintiff Attorneys: Laura Fairneny; Rachel Kassabian. Defendant Attorneys: David Caine; Brian Danitz; Steven Guggenheim; Dylan Liddiard. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 440 Discovery Letter Brief re Gary Olsen Deposition filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 12/18/2014) Modified on 12/19/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE: GARY OLSEN DEPOSITION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/18/2014 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 12/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 438 Discovery Letter Briefre Gary Olsen Deposition filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 437 Discovery Letter Brief re Gary Olsen Deposition filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 435 Letter Brief unsealed with unsealed exhibits from Dkt. #400 and #409 in accordance with Court's Order in Dkt. #433 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Unsealed), #2 Exhibit 2 (Unsealed), #3 Exhibit 6 (Unsealed), #4 Exhibit 7 (Unsealed), #5 Exhibit 8 (Unsealed), #6 Exhibit 9 (Unsealed))(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 434 Letter Brief unsealed with unsealed exhibits from Dkt. #405 and #406 in accordance with the Court's Order in Dkt. #433 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (Unsealed), #2 Exhibit 7 (Unsealed), #3 Exhibit 8 (Unsealed), #4 Exhibit 9 (Unsealed), #5 Exhibit 12 (Unsealed), #6 Exhibit 13 (Unsealed), #7 Exhibit 14 (Unsealed), #8 Exhibit 15 (Unsealed), #9 Exhibit 16 (Unsealed))(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER RE: WRITTEN DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/16/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 432 Letter Brief Responding to Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File A Motion for Summary Judgment filed byEitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edmundo Marquez ISO Defs Admn Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Defs Ltr Brief Responding to Pltffs Request to File MSJ (Public Redacted), #4 Exhibit Defs Ltr Brief Responding to Pltffs Request to File MSJ (Filed Under Seal), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 430 RESPONSE to re #427 Letter Brief of Defendants Requesting Leave of Court to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by Angioscore, Inc.. (Sun, Nathan) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 429 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 428 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing Re: Dkt Nos. 400, 401, 402, 403, and 405 held on 12/15/2014. Court to issue written orderFTR Time 9:03-10:13. Plaintiff Attorneys: Steve Hanle; Margret Caruso; Suong Nguyen; Kimball Parker. Defendant Attorneys: Dylan Liddiard; Brian Danitz. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 427 Letter Brief Requesting Leave of Court to File a Motion for Summary Judgment filed byEitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edmundo Marquez ISO Defs Ltr Brief Requesting Leave to File MSJ, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Defs Ltr Brief Requesting Leave to File MSJ (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit Defs Ltr Brief Requesting Leave to File MSJ (Public), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Letter Requesting Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/10/2014) Modified on 12/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2014 Filing 424 Letter Brief Requesting Leave of Court to File a Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 423 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the discovery hearing currently scheduled for December 11, 2014 is continued to December 15, 2014 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 422 Letter Brief In Further Response to Defendants' Discovery Letter Brief I - Dkt. #401 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 421 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen in Support of #409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to DKT 400 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen re Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Motion [Dkt No. 409] filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #409 ) (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 420 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #402 Discovery Letter Brief II, #403 Discovery Letter Brief III, #399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #402 , #403 , #399 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 419 Declaration of Edmundo C Marquez in Support of #406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to Dkt 405 filed byEitan Konstantino. (Related document(s) #406 ) (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/5/14. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 417 Letter Brief CORRECTION OF DOCKET #416 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 416 Letter Brief re #412 Order regarding Defendants Letter Brief Re Subpoena to Non-Party John Sellers filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #412 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 415 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD:Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for December 11, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 414 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angioscore, Inc. re #409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to DKT 400, #408 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to Dkt 405, #407 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #411 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #410 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 413 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino re #399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS LETTER BRIEF RE: SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY JOHN SELLERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/4/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 411 EXHIBITS re #409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to DKT 400 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief (Redactions Highlighted))(Related document(s) #409 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 410 EXHIBITS re #406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to Dkt 405 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (Unsealed), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Unsealed))(Related document(s) #406 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 409 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to DKT 400 filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 1 (Unsealed), #5 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 2 (Unsealed), #7 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 3 (Unsealed), #9 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit 4 (Unsealed), #11 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit 5 (Unsealed), #13 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit 6 (Unsealed), #15 Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit 7 (Unsealed), #17 Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit 8 (Unsealed), #19 Exhibit 9 (Sealed), #20 Exhibit 9 (Unsealed), #21 Exhibit 12 (Sealed), #22 Exhibit 12 (Unsealed))(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 408 EXHIBITS re #406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to Dkt 405 Exhibits 14-16 to AngioScore's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 (Unsealed), #2 Exhibit 15 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 15 (Unsealed), #4 Exhibit 16 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 16 (Unsealed))(Related document(s) #406 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 407 EXHIBITS re #406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to Dkt 405 Exhibit 13 to AngioScore's Administrative Motion to Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 (Unsealed))(Related document(s) #406 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal relating to Dkt 405 filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 2 (Unsealed), #5 Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 7 (Unsealed), #7 Exhibit 12 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 12 (Unsealed))(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 405 Letter from AngioScore and Defendants Regarding Defendants Document Production and Privilege Log. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 (Sealed), #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 (Sealed), #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 (Sealed), #18 Proposed Order)(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 404 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #400 Letter,, filed byEitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 11, 2014 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Decl of Legal Pursuit, #3 Exhibit C - Nov 25, 2014 Email)(Related document(s) #400 ) (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 403 Discovery Letter Brief III filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 402 Discovery Letter Brief II filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Marquez ISO Discovery Letter Brief II, #2 Exhibit A - Konstantino 2nd Request for Production of Documents to AngioScore, #3 Exhibit B - Konstantino 3rd Request for Production of Documents to AngioScore)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 401 Discovery Letter Brief I filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 400 Letter from AngioScore and Defendants regarding Defendants' Discovery Responses. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Order)(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edmundo Marquez, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Unredacted Discovery Letter Brief II, #4 Exhibit A - Redacted Discovery Letter Brief II, #5 Exhibit B - Unredacted Discovery Letter Brief III, #6 Exhibit B - Redacted Discovery Letter Brief III, #7 Exhibit C - Redacted Ex. C. to Decl. of E. Marquez)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 398 Letter from Defendant Eitan Konstantino re Subpoena to Non-Party John Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Caine, David) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 397 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen in Support of #393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen re Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Motion for Leave to Amend Reply Brief and Exhibits filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #393 ) (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 396 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Please see dkt. no. #392 . (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #388 Stipulation for Order Authorizing Limited Rule 30(b)(6) Depositon of AngioScore, Inc. After the Non-Expert Deposition Cutoff (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 REDACTED Reply Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #5 SEALED Reply Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #6 Declaration of Steven Hanle ISO Reply Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #7 Exhibit Sealed Ex 1 part 1, #8 Exhibit Sealed Ex 1 part 2, #9 Exhibit Sealed Ex 1 part 3, #10 Exhibit Sealed Ex 1 part 4, #11 Exhibit Sealed Ex 1 part 5, #12 Exhibit Sealed Ex 1 part 6, #13 Exhibit Sealed Ex 2, #14 Exhibit Sealed Ex 3)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RE: PIPER JAFFRAY & CO. SUBPOENA.(jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE: SPECTRANETICS SUBPOENAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/25/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 390 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #381 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A,C, and D to Declaration of Brandon Baum in Support of Opposition to Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions After Discovery Cutoff filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #381 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 22, 2014 Filing 389 Discovery Letter Brief(regarding Dkt Nos. 379, 387) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 11/22/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 388 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Order Authorizing Limited Rule 30(b)(6) Depositon of AngioScore, Inc. After the Non-Expert Deposition Cutoff filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2014) Modified on 11/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 Filing 387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply Letter Brief re Piper Jaffray Subpoena) filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit (Letter Brief - redacted), #3 Exhibit (Letter Brief - CONF), #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER RE: FURTHER REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S LETTER BRIEF RE: PIPER JAFFRAY SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 21, 2014. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 385 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 11/10/14, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:02 - 3:21. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #368 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2015. (Related documents(s) #368 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 384 Letter from Non-Party Piper Jaffray (Response to Defendant's Letter Brief re Subpoena). (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 383 ERRATA re #382 Opposition/Response to Motion, (NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS CORRECTING TABLE OF AUTHORITIES) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 382 RESPONSE (re #346 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infrigement Contentions ) After the Close of Discovery filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Baum, #2 Exhibit A - Confidential, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Confidential, #5 Exhibit D - Confidential, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Caine, David) (Filed on 11/18/2014) Modified on 11/19/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2014 Filing 381 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A,C, and D to Declaration of Brandon Baum in Support of Opposition to Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions After Discovery Cutoff filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Baum in Support of Administrative Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A - Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D - Under Seal, #5 Proposed Order)(Caine, David) (Filed on 11/18/2014) Modified on 11/19/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S LETTER BRIEF RE: PIPER JAFFRAY SUBPOENA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/18/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Letter Brief Seeking Production of Documents from Non-Party Piper Jaffray) filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit (REDACTED-PUBLIC) Ltr to Judge Corley re Piper Jaffray Subpoena, #3 Exhibit SEALED LTR BRIEF, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 378 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Turbow ISO Defs Admn Mot to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defs Admn Mot to File Under Seal, #3 Exhibit (REDACTED-PUBLIC) Ltr to Judge Corley re Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit (UNREDACTED) Ltr to Judge Corley re Order to Show Cause, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 376 Letter from AngioScore, Inc. and non-party Spectranetics JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part #371 Stipulation EXTENDING JOINT DISCOVERY LETTERS REGARDING WRITTEN DISCOVERY (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #372 Stipulation Authorizing Depositions of Eitan Konstantino and Gimmoey Ong After the Non-expert Deposition Cutoff (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 373 REPLY (re #365 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Strike and Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Dkt. No. 351-1]) ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 372 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Depositions of Eitan Konstantino and Gimmoey Ong After the Non-expert Deposition Cutoff filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2014 Filing 371 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Joint Discovery Letters Regarding Written Discovery filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2014 Filing 370 RESPONSE (re #365 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Strike and Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Dkt. No. 351-1]) ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 368 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance by Margret Mary Caruso (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 12, 2014 Filing 366 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #365 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Strike and Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Dkt. No. 351-1]) by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2014 Filing 365 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Strike and Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Dkt. No. 351-1]) filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Nguyen, #2 Proposed Order)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Filing 364 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Daniel Robson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9065832.) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Robson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER RE: JOINT LETTER BRIEF -- FELD DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/12/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL re #266 , #268 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/12/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Filing 361 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on November 10, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (FTR Digital Recording:3:02-3:21). (Date Filed: 11/10/2014)(ahm, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Filing 360 Declaration of Michael D.K. Nguyen in Support of #352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #352 ) (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2014 Filing 359 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Duy Khiem Nguyen (Nguyen, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by James Carl Otteson (Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 357 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Telephone Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Magistrate Judge Corley will hold a telephone discovery hearing at 3:00 p.m. on Monday, November 10, 2014 regarding Docket No. 355. Parties shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. Any further joint discovery letters regarding written discovery must be filed on or before November 14, 2014, unless the parties agree to a later date not to exceed Dec. 1, 2014. The parties must meet and confer in person prior to bringing any discovery dispute to the Court's attention and lead counsel must attend the conference; for Plaintiff that means Ms. Doolittle or Mr. Feldman must attend unless the parties agree otherwise. The parties should discuss who is attending the in-person meet and confer before the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JOINT LETTER RE: SPECTRANETICS SUBPOENA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/7/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 355 Discovery Letter Brief regarding Tanhum Feld filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 354 Amended MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Unopposed) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 353 Declaration of David A. Caine in Support of #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #347 , #343 ) (Caine, David) (Filed on 11/4/2014) Modified on 11/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2014 Filing 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration De La Cruz Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex 1 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 351 Declaration of Steven Hanle in Support of #347 -5, #346 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infrigement Contentions CORRECTED filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit REDACTED Ex 1 ***REMOVED PER COURT ORDER #453 ***(Related document(s) #347 , #346 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/4/2014) Modified on 11/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/7/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2014 Filing 350 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ; Docket Nos. 343-5 and 346-2 filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for All Discovery purposes, including parties' pending dispute #344 ; #345 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #345 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Joint Letter Regarding Konstantino's Subpoenas to Spectranetics, and (2) Konstantino's October 17 Subpoena to Spectranetics filed by Angioscore, Inc., #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc., #348 Discovery Letter Briefregarding Konstantino's Subpoenas to Spectranetics filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/4/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 348 Discovery Letter Brief regarding Konstantino's Subpoenas to Spectranetics filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 11/4/2014) Modified on 11/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2014 Filing 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of De La Cruz, #2 Exhibit 2 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit 3 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #4 Exhibit 4 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #5 Sealed Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 346 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infrigement Contentions filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/18/2014. Replies due by 11/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Hanle ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # (2) Exhibit 1 ***REMOVED PER COURT ORDER #453 ***, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/4/2014) Modified on 11/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/7/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2014 Filing 345 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Joint Letter Regarding Konstantino's Subpoenas to Spectranetics, and (2) Konstantino's October 17 Subpoena to Spectranetics filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter, #5 Redacted Version of Konstantino's Subpoena to Spectranetics, #6 Unredacted Version of Konstantino's Subpoena to Spectranetics, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 344 INCORRECT EVENT. SEE CORRECTED ENTRY AT DKT. NO. 348 Letter from AngioScore, Inc. and Defendants re Spectranetics Subpoena . (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 11/3/2014) Modified on 11/4/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2014 Filing 343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #4 Unredacted Version of Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #5 Declaration Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions , # (6) Exhibit 1 ***REMOVED PER COURT ORDER #453 , #7 Exhibit 2 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #8 Exhibit 3 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #9 Exhibit 4 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/31/2014) Modified on 11/5/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/7/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2014 Filing 342 AMENDED ANSWER to AngioScore Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint on behalf of Defs. TriReme Medical, QT Vascular and Quattro Vascular byTrireme Medical, Inc.. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 341 AMENDED ANSWER to AngioScore Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint byEitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 340 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/06/2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 2:06 p.m - 217 p.m., 2:38 p.m. to 2:52 p.m. and 4:54 p.m. to 5:11 p.m. = Total 37 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 19, 2014 Filing 339 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 11, 2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #252 Transcript Order, #255 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2014. (Related document(s) #252 , #255 ) (rhm) (Filed on 10/19/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER re #319 Joint Stipulated Scheduling Proposal. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on October 17, 2014. (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 337 NOTICE by Angioscore, Inc. Designation of Co-Lead Trial Counsel (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 336 REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND PRETRIAL CASE SCHEDULE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE BIFURCATE PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS; EXHIBITS (pursuant to re #329 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #329 ) (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 10/15/2014) Modified on 10/16/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION IN PATENT CASE re #333 Letter filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/14/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Guggenheim (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 333 Letter from AngioScore and Defendants Regarding a Second Day of Patent Deposition for Eitan Konstantino. (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by David Sidney Steuer (Steuer, David) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 330 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #311 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Laura Fairneny representing plaintiff (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 328 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 10/9/2014). Pretrial Statement due 3/13/15. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/27/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 1/14/15; Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for Tuesday, 2/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Recording #FTR 2:06pm-2:17pm and 2:38pm-2:52pm and 4:54pm-5:11pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2014) Modified on 10/10/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Suong Nguyen (Nguyen, Suong) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 325 Defs. TriReme, Quattro and QT's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byTrireme Medical, Inc.. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 324 Def. Eitan Konstantino's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byEitan Konstantino. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER WITHDRAWING JOSEPH R. RE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD re #316 Notice (Other), filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., Attorney Joseph Robert Re terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER WITHDRAWING SHEILA SWAROOP AS COUNSEL OF RECORD re #315 Notice (Other), filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., Attorney Sheila Neha Swaroop terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER WITHDRAWING JOSHUA STOWELL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD re #314 Notice (Other), filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., Attorney Joshua Jan Stowell terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF WILLIAM GERARD VON HOFFMAN, III as counsel re #313 Notice (Other), filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., Attorney William Gerard von Hoffmann, III terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 319 Joint Stipulated Scheduling Proposal filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore Inc. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2014 Filing 318 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 317 Declaration of Daniel W. Turbow in Support of #306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #306 ) (Turbow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE and (Proposed) Order of Withdrawal of Joseph R. Re as counsel of record for TriReme Medical, LLC, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular Pte. Ltd., and QT Vascular Ltd., and Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Re, Joseph) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2014 Filing 315 NOTICE and (Proposed Order) of Withdrawal of Sheila N. Swaroop as counsel of record for TriReme Medical, LLC, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular Pte. Ltd., and QT Vascular Ltd. by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2014 Filing 314 NOTICE and (Proposed) Order of Withdrawal of Joshua Stowell as counsel of record for TriReme Medical, LLC, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular Pte. Ltd., and QT Vascular Ltd., by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2014 Filing 313 NOTICE and (Proposed) Order of Withdrawal of William Gerard Von Hoffmann, III as counsel of record for TriReme Medical, LLC, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular Pte. Ltd., and QT Vascular Ltd. by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (von Hoffmann, William) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Filing 311 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Laura L. Fairneny ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8944197.) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING)(Fairneny, Laura) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY AT DKT. NO. 309 ORDER DENYING #298 MOTION to Amend Pretrial Case Schedule;granting in part and denying in part; in the Alternative Bifurcate Plaintiff's State Law ClaimsMOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd; DENYING AS MOOT #299 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd.; REQUIRING FILING OF JOINT STATUS STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014) Modified on 9/23/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/23/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Order by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #298 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #298 Motion to Bifurcate; denying #299 MOTION to Shorten Time. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014) Modified on 9/23/2014 (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2014 Filing 312 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference HELD (Date Filed: 9/22/2014). (Court Reporter NOT REPORTED.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas T. Carmack (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 21, 2014 Filing 307 Declaration of Rachel Herrick Kassabian in Support of #306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and in Support of Opposition to Motion to Amend Pretrial Case Schedule filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #306 ) (Kassabian, Rachel) (Filed on 9/21/2014)
September 21, 2014 Filing 306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend Pretrial Case Schedule, #5 Redacted Version of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend Pretrial Case Schedule, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12)(Kassabian, Rachel) (Filed on 9/21/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 305 RESPONSE (re #299 MOTION to Shorten Time ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Kassabian (Kassabian, Rachel) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER RE: PRIVILEGE LOG DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/18/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 302 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 9/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/18/2014). (FTR Recording 10:35-10:48) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Telephone Conference, dial in call, with Lead Counsel Robert Feldman and Dylan Liddiard is set for 9/22/2014 04:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 301 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a telephonic discovery hearing is scheduled for September 18, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery for dkt. no. 290 only (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 300 Declaration of Brian Danitz in Support of #298 MOTION to Amend/Correct Pretrial Case Schedule or in the Alternative MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiff's State Law Claims, #299 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #298 , #299 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION to Shorten Time re #298 MOTION to Amend Pretrial Case Schedule or in the Alternative MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 Filing 298 MOTION to Amend Pretrial Case Schedule or in the Alternative MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/29/2014. Replies due by 10/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley as to the defendant's request of 9/8/14 [Dkt. no. 290], the parties dispute regarding plaintiff's privilege log. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 10/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Joint CMC statement filed by 11/29/14. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/15/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery in re: dkt. no. 290 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 296 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 295 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 294 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #262 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims in Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 291 Letter from Robert P. Feldman to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers . (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 290 Letter from Defendants to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 289 Letter from Robert P. Feldman to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers; Response to counsel's 09/05/2014 Letter. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 288 Letter from Defendants to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers re Request for Case Management Conference . (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 287 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE SEPTEMBER 9, 2014 AT 2:00PM MOTION HEARING DATE.The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint #262 is VACATED. The matter is taken under submission on the papers. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 286 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-19-14, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224 wyattkathy994@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #283 Transcript Order, #284 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014. (Related documents(s) #283 , #284 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 285 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (COUNTERCLAIMS 3 - 8) filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical Inc, Angioscore Inc. (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2014 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 282 Minute Entry: Status Conference HELD. The Friday 8/22/14 at 9:00am Status Conference is VACATED. (Date Filed: 8/19/2014). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 281 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #268 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #268 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 280 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., QT Vascular Ltd., Eitan Konstantino. (Bers, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 8/18/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Filing 279 REPLY (re #262 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #275 Order, Set Hearings,, Identifying Lead Trial Counsel Pursuant to Order (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE by Angioscore, Inc. Designation of Lead Counsel (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 276 Letter Brief Requesting Pre-Filing Conference Pursuant to Paragraph 9(b) of Court's Standing Order filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF, DKT. NO. 269 Meet and Confer Session at Courthouse is set for Tuesday, 8/19/2014 08:30 AM as ordered by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/14/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimball Dean Parker (Parker, Kimball) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #272 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 272 Notice of Errata re Exhibit A re #268 -3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Submitted Under Seal in its Entirety)(Related document(s) #268 ) (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2014) Modified on 8/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Discovery Letter Brief (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #269 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #268 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 269 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-submitted under seal, #2 Exhibit B-submitted under seal, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 268 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Exhibit A to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief (FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT #272 -1, #4 Unredacted Exhibit B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 8/13/2014) Modified on 8/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2014 Filing 267 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS TRIREME MEDICAL, LLC, EITAN KONSTANTINO, QUATTRO VASCULAR PTE LTD., and QT VASCULAR LTD.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A TO THE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS TRIREME MEDICAL, LLC, EITAN KONSTANTINO, QUATTRO VASCULAR PTE LTD., and QT VASCULAR LTD.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A TO THE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Caine in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Caine, David) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 265 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 264 RESPONSE (re #262 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Bers, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #261 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Charlene Koski representing Defendants. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 31, 2014 Filing 262 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/8/2014. Replies due by 8/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 261 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Charlene Koski ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8809764.) filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Koski, Charlene) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #257 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter Armenio representing Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #258 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Farber representing Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 Filing 258 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #256 ) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8789299.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/23/2014 filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Farber, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/23/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 Filing 257 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8789712.) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Armenio, Peter) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 Filing 256 ***FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT CASE NUMBER, SEE DOCUMENT #258 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8789299.) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Farber, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/23/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2014 Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND AMENDING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/22/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot #230 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. The motion hearing set for 7/29/2014 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Fourth Amended Complaint filed by 7/31/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Feldman (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane M. Doolittle APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Doolittle, Diane) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 248 Joint Submission Regarding [Proposed] Scheduling Order Pursuant to the Court's July 8, 2014 Order Setting Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause #232 by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc., AngioScore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery and Amending Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 Filing 247 DECLARATION OF SHEILA N. SWAROOP IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JULY 11, 2014 ORDER (DKT. NO. 243) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of Ex. 26 to Dkt. No. 199, #2 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of Ex. M to Dkt. No. 209, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of Ex. H to Dkt. No. 213, #4 Exhibit Revised Unredacted Version of Ex. 26 to Dkt. No. 199, #5 Exhibit Revised Unredacted Version of Ex. M to Dkt. No. 209, #6 Exhibit Revised Unredacted Version of Ex. H to Dkt. No. 213)(Related document(s) #209 , #213 , #199 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2014 Filing 246 STATEMENT in Response to Defendants' Reply in support of (re #230 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified on 7/17/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2014 Filing 245 REPLY (re #230 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint ) filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 244 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 251 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 7/11/2014), Show Cause Hearing held on 7/11/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 7/11/2014). Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for Friday, 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 4/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 10 Day Jury Trial RESET for 4/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/20/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 2/13/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS re #219 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File #218 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF Counsel re #236 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., QT Vascular Ltd., Attorney John Stuart Claassen terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/10/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 241 Proposed] Order Striking Discovery Requests of Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. and Amending Pretrial and Trial Schedule by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 240 SUMMARY of Discovery Objections per the court's order of 7/8/2014 #232 by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Summary of Discovery Objections, #2 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 239 Declaration of Dylan J. Liddiard in Support of #238 Defendants' Submission Outlining Objections to Plaintiff's Requests Pursuant to the Court's July 8, 2014 Order Setting Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #238 ) (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 238 Defendants' Submission Outlining Objections to Plaintiff's Requests Pursuant to the Court's July 8, 2014 Order Setting Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Filing 237 Response to Order to Show Cause #232 Order byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel and (Proposed) Order by John Stuart Claassen (Claassen, John) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 235 Amended Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in response to the court's June 25, 2014 orders (dkt #s 218 & 219) with SEALED EXHIBITS filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Under Seal Exs. 2-9, 11, 12, 16 and 21 Docket No. 138, #2 Exhibit Under Seal Exs. C-G Docket No. 184, #3 Exhibit Under Seal Exs. 1-3 Docket No. 186, #4 Exhibit Part 1 - Under Seal Exs. 7-12, 15-17, 18-23 and 26 Docket No. 199, #5 Exhibit Part 2 - Under Seal Exs. 7-12, 15-17, 18-23 and 26 Docket No. 199, #6 Exhibit Part 3 - Under Seal Exs. 7-12, 15-17, 18-23 and 26 Docket No. 199, #7 Exhibit Under Seal Exs. B-C, E,J and M Docket No. 209, #8 Exhibit Under Seal Exs. E-N Docket No. 213)(Related document(s) #184 , #186 , #138 , #209 , #213 , #199 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 234 Amended Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Response to the court's 6/25/2014 order re #219 Order, #218 Order filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 2-9, 11, 12, 16 and 21 Docket No. 138, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exs. C-G Docket No. 184, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 1-3 Docket No.186, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 7-12, 15-17, 18-23 and 26 Docket No. 199, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exs. B-C, E, J and M Docket No. 209, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exs. E-N Docket No. 213)(Related document(s) #219 , #218 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 233 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Angioscore, Inc. . (Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 7/11/2014 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5:00pm on Thursday, 7/10/2014. Case Management Conference set for Friday, 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Responses due by 7/15/2014. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #230 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint. Replies due by 7/22/2014. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 231 Joint Statement regarding additional discovery by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical Inc, Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd, QT Vascular Ltd. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION to Dismiss AngioScore, Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Danitz (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Wagner Turbow (Turbow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmundo Clay Marquez (Marquez, Edmundo) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas James Martin (Martin, Thomas) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan James Liddiard (Liddiard, Dylan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 224 Certificate of Interested Entities by Angioscore, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Spectranetics Corporation for Angioscore, Inc.. and Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon D. Baum (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by David Adam Caine (Caine, David) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 221 EXHIBITS re #220 Amended Complaint Exhibit A to Third Amended Complaint filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #220 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 220 AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Demand against All Defendants. Filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTIONS TO SEAL; RESOLVING OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES; AND AMENDING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. denying #152 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #163 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #202 Motion for Leave to File; denying #209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #215 Discovery Letter Brief (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #131 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying without prejudice #138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #139 Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2014. Non-Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2014. Motions filed by by 11/4/2014. Private Mediation completed by 7/21/14. Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 2/25/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 7 to 10 Day Jury Trial set for 2/25/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Daubert Motions or authorized Summary Judgment Motion from Plaintiff Hearing set for 12/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 1/16/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 217 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT SET 6/10/2014. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 216 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits E-N filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #213 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 30, 2014 Filing 215 Joint Discovery Letter Brief to Compel Initial Disclosures from QTV and Quattro Vascular filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 214 REPLY (re #202 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order, #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of James Andrews, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order to Seal Documents, #3 Exhibit E (unredacted), #4 Exhibit F (unredacted), #5 Exhibit G (unredacted), #6 Exhibit H (unredacted), #7 Exhibit I (unredacted), #8 Exhibit J (unredacted), #9 Exhibit K (unredacted), #10 Exhibit L (unredacted), #11 Exhibit M (unredacted), #12 Exhibit N (unredacted))(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 212 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B-C, E, I-J, and M, and Portions of Defs. Opposition to Motion to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order and for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #209 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by John Stuart Claassen (Claassen, John) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. re #209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B-C, E, I-J, and M, and Portions of Defs. Opposition of Unredacted Versions of Certain Exhibits and of Opposition to AngioScore Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B-C, E, I-J, and M, and Portions of Defs. Opposition filed by Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila Swaroop in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants Opposition to AngioScore Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint and to Modify the CMO, #4 Unredacted Version of Defendants Opposition to AngioScore Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint and to Modify the CMO, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration in Support of Defendants Opposition to AngioScore Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint and to Modify the CMO, #6 Unredacted Version of Declaration in Support of Defendants Opposition to AngioScore Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint and to Modify the CMO)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 208 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Hanle Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #199 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 207 Corrected Proposed Order #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Hanle Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Angioscore, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 206 Declaration in Support of #202 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order CORRECTED filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 6, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #202 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 205 Proposed Order re #202 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order by Angioscore, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angioscore, Inc. re #201 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #200 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Hanle Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 203 Declaration in Support of #202 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 202 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 201 EXHIBITS re #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Hanle Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Exhibit 17 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) #199 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 200 EXHIBITS re #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Hanle Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Exhibit 12 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) #199 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Hanle Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration De La Cruz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 198 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #196 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, byAngioscore, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 197 Certificate of Interested Entities by QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Three Arch Partners, Other Affiliate Adams Street Partners, Other Affiliate EDBI Pte Ltd., Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson Development Corporation, Other Affiliate Luminor Capitol for QT Vascular Ltd., QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 196 Quattro Vascular and QT Vascular ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Angioscore, Inc. byQuattro Vascular PTE Ltd., QT Vascular Ltd.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER RE:STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/23/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 17, 2014 Filing 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION DEADLINES filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. De La Cruz)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN re #176 Motion for Order filed by Angioscore, Inc. The order requiring supplemental briefing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/15/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 192 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Declare Proper Service And Jurisdiction Over QT Vascular Ltd. and Quattro Vascular Pte. Ltd. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 191 Statement of Non-Opposition re #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Motion for Order Regarding Service of Summons and Personal Jurisdiction filed byEitan Konstantino, QT Vascular Ltd., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #186 , #176 , #190 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 4/9/2014) Modified on 4/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND VACATING HEARING. The motion hearing set for 4/8/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 189 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AngioScore's Reply in Support of Its Motion re Service of Summons and Exhibits 1-3 filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #186 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 188 EXHIBITS: Corrected Redacted Version of Reply to Opposition re #186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #186 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 3/20/2014) Modified on 3/21/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 Filing 187 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Related document(s) #186 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Sealing Documents, #3 Redacted Version of Reply Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and That Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and That Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #5 Exhibit Unredacted 1 to De La Cruz Declaration ISO Reply Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and That Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 2 to De La Cruz Declaration ISO Reply Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and That Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #7 Exhibit Unredacted 3 to De La Cruz Declaration ISO Reply Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and That Personal Jurisdiction Exists)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Unredacted Copy of Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop with Exhibit B-G in SupportoOf Defendants Trireme Medical, LLC and Eitan Konstantinos Opposition to Angioscores Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists Over Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd., filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Filing 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B-G to the Declaration of Sheila N. Swarop filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of Defendants TriReme Medical, LLC and Eitan Konstantinos Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants TriReme Medical, LLC and Eitan Konstantinos Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits, #3 Redacted version of the Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of Defendants TriReme Medical, LLC and Eitan Konstantinos Opposition to Angioscores Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. And QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists Over Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd., #4 Unredacted version of Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of Defendants TriReme Medical, LLC and Eitan Konstantinos Opposition to Angioscores Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. And QT Vascular Ltd. Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists Over Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd. and QT Vascular Ltd.)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 183 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #182 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Seal Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular Pte Ltd. and Qt Vascular Ltd. Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists Over Quattro Vascular Pte Ltd. and Qt Vascular Ltd., filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #182 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Filing 182 Memorandum in Opposition re #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for an Order Declaring Service on Quattro Vascular Pte Ltd. and Qt Vascular Ltd. Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists Over Quattro Vascular Pte Ltd. and Qt Vascular Ltd., filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 Filing 181 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2014. (Related documents(s) #174 , #175 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 180 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AngioScore Motion Re Service and Certain Exhibits filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #176 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 179 [CORRECTED] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #177 Declaration in Support, 178 Clerks Notice, #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Angioscore, Inc. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 2/27/2014) Modified on 2/28/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 Filing 178 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING ON CALENDAR RE DKT. 176-3 RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DECLARING SERVICE OF SUMMONS, Set/Reset Deadlines as to [176-3] filed within the Administrative Motion to File Under Seal . Motion Hearing set for TUESDAY 4/8/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 177 Declaration of Steven M. Hanle in Support of #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #2 Exhibit 4 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #3 Exhibit 5 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #4 Exhibit 12 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #5 Exhibit 17 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #6 Exhibit 18 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #7 Exhibit 19 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #8 Exhibit 20 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #9 Proposed Order Declaring Service is Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Related document(s) #176 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #5 Exhibit 2 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #6 Exhibit 3 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #7 Exhibit 6 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #8 Exhibit 7 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #9 Exhibit 8 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #10 Exhibit 9 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #11 Exhibit 10 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #12 Exhibit 11 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #13 Exhibit 13 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #14 Exhibit 14 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #15 Exhibit 15 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists, #16 Exhibit 16 to Hanle Declaration ISO Motion for Order Declaring Service of Summons Effective and Personal Jurisdiction Exists)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Motions hearing held on 02/14/14, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Motions hearing held on 02/14/14, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., for Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #171 Stipulation to Continue Expert-Related Deadlines (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 171 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Expert-Related Deadlines on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua J. Stowell in Support of Stipulation to Continue Expert-Related Deadlines)(Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 2/20/2014) Modified on 2/21/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2014 Filing 172 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 2/14/2014 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 2/14/2014) re #131 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119, #139 Motion to Strike. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2014) Modified on 2/24/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, Attorney Charles August Kertell terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/11/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Charles A. Kertell as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. and Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Kertell, Charles) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #166 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Angioscore, Inc., Attorney Ehab Monsef Samuel terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #165 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Angioscore, Inc., Attorney Allan William Jansen terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ehab M. Samuel As Counsel of Record for Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. and Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal, filed by Ehab Monsef Samuel (Samuel, Ehab) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Allan W. Jansen As Counsel of Record for Plaintiff AngioScore, Inc. and Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal, filed by Allan William Jansen (Jansen, Allan) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 164 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing to FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2014 AT 1:00PM (PLEASE NOTE TIME). Set/Reset Deadlines as to #139 MOTION to Strike, #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/14 is CONTINUED to FRIDAY, 2/14/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 163 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 2/3/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR DISCOVERY RELIEF re #157 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/30/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #159 Stipulation Changing Time; The Deadline to complete Private Mediation is continued to 30 days after the Court's ruling on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 160 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re Motion to Compel, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Order Changing Time re #93 Order to Show Cause, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Hanle ISO Joint Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2014 Filing 158 RESPONSE (re #155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 in Support of its Motion to Compel Satusky Continued Deposition ) filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 157 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief #1, #2 Letter Brief #2, #3 Letter Brief #3, #4 Letter Brief #4, #5 Letter Brief #5, #6 Letter Brief #6, #7 Declaration Declaration of A. De La Cruz RE ECF Technical Failure for Jan. 24, 2014 filing)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 156 Brief re #152 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Compelling Documents Responsive to RFP No. 54 and Continuing Satusky Deposition filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #152 ) (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 in Support of its Motion to Compel Satusky Continued Deposition filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 2)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF OF JANUARY 13, 2014. Plaintiff's brief filed Noon on Friday 1/24/2014; Defendant's brief filed by Noon on Wednesday, 1/29/2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/21/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 153 Reply Memorandum re #139 Motion to Strike filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Filing 152 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Compelling Documents Responsive to RFP No. 54 and Continuing Satusky Deposition, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstanti, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 Filing 151 Memorandum in Opposition re #139 Motion to Strike, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of Opposition and Exs. 1-3)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING DISCOVERY RELIEF; GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE ORDER; CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #139 MOTION to Strike, #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/3/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 149 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Compliance with ESI Order, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 1/2/2014) Modified on 1/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2013 Filing 148 Supplemental Declaration in Support of #147 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) #147 ) (Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2013 Filing 147 REPLY (re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119 ) filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Re, Joseph) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 146 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 12/27/2013) Modified on 12/30/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2013 Filing 145 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 26, 2013 Filing 144 Statement of Non-Opposition re #135 MOTION to Vacate the Court's Order Authorizing Deposition of Yancy Meneses filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Related document(s) #135 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 24, 2013 Filing 143 CORRECTED Declaration of Marc E. Levenston, Ph.d in Support re #138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/24/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2013 Filing 142 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #140 Declaration in Opposition, #139 Motion to Strike, #100 Response, #132 Declaration in Support, filed by Angioscore, Inc. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2013 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angioscore, Inc. re #138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #140 Declaration in Opposition, #139 Motion to Strike, #100 Response, #132 Declaration in Support, (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2013 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Andre De La Cruz in Opposition to #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) #131 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION to Strike #132 Declaration in Support, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/6/2014. Replies due by 1/13/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Hanle ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Renewed Motion to Strike, #2 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion to Strike)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2013 Filing 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz ISO Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted Version of Horzewski Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Unredacted Version of Horzewski Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Redacted Version of Levenston Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Unredacted Version of Levenston Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Sealed Exhibits to Declaration of Steven Hanle ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 137 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #135 MOTION to Vacate the Court's Order Authorizing Deposition of Yancy Meneses filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #135 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 136 Declaration of James W. Geriak in Support of #135 MOTION to Vacate the Court's Order Authorizing Deposition of Yancy Meneses filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #135 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 135 MOTION to Vacate the Court's Order Authorizing Deposition of Yancy Meneses filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/26/2013. Replies due by 1/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Meneses Declaration)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. re #133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exs. B and C to Konstantino Declaration in Support of TriReme and Konstantino Motion for Summary Judgment Service of Unredacted Version of Konstantino Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exs. B and C to Konstantino Declaration in Support of TriReme and Konstantino Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to File Under Seal Exs. B and C to Konstantino Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Exs. B & C to Konstantino Declaration, #3 Redacted Version of Konstantino Declaration in Support of Defendants' MSJ - Exs. B & C Redacted, #4 Unredacted Version of Konstantino Declaration in Support of Defendants' MSJ - Includes Exs. B & C)(Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 132 Declaration of Joshua Stowell in Support of #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119 filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits D - J, #2 Exhibit Exhibits K - P)(Related document(s) #131 ) (Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Pat. 7691119 filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/23/2013. Replies due by 12/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Of Dr. Amir Belson in support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Proposed Order Granting TriReme and Konstantino Motion for Summary Judgment)(Re, Joseph) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 130 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/10/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angioscore, Inc. re #125 Summons Issued as to Quattro Vascular Pte. Ltd. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angioscore, Inc. re #119 Summons Issued as to QT Vascular Ltd. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 127 Answer to #118 Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint; COUNTERCLAIM against Angioscore, Inc., filed by Trireme Medical, Inc., Eitan Konstantino. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 11/27/2013) Modified on 12/2/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 Filing 126 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 8, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2014. (Related document(s) #117 , #116 ) (rhm) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 125 Summons Issued as to Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd.. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 124 Proposed Summons. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 123 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Angioscore, Inc. as to Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Payment Pursuant to Court's Order re #121 Order, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 11/20/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING #90 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint ;Imposing Sanctions; Authorizing Deposition; Excusing Requirement of Pre-Filing Conference; Vacating Claim Construction Hearing; Overruling Objection as Moot. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/13/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 119 Summons Issued as to QT Vascular Ltd.. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #109 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 118 SUPPLEMENTAL AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against QT Vascular Ltd., Eitan Konstantino, Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Trireme Medical, Inc.. Filed by Angioscore, Inc., . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2013) Modified on 11/13/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2013 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Hearing Held on 11/08/13, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Angioscore, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 11/12/2013) Modified on 11/13/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2013 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for OSC Hearing Held on 11/08/13 and Motion Hearing Held on 11/08/13, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 11/12/2013) Modified on 11/13/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION to Strike #100 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/25/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz, #2 Exhibit 1 to De La Cruz Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to De La Cruz Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 114 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 11/8/2013 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 11/8/2013), Show Cause Hearing held on 11/8/2013 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 11/8/2013), Motion Hearing held and granted on 11/8/2013 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 11/8/2013) re #90 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint and Modify Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Angioscore, Inc. The 11/15/13 at 10:00am Claim Construction Hearing is VACATED. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2013 Filing 113 CLERKS NOTICE re deficiency of document #112 (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 112 OBJECTIONS to re #100 Response ( Non Motion ) and Request to Strike Declaration and Expert Testimony of Amir Belson by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz, #2 Exhibit 1 to Andre De La Cruz Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Andre De La Cruz Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 111 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 8, 2013 AT 9:00AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. re #89 Order, Set Hearings,,,, Defendants' Notice of Compliance with 10-01-2013 Order (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory re Tanhum Feld, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Letter of Request to Tanhum Feld)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 10/31/2013) Modified on 11/1/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #105 Motion authorizing equipment for courtroom for 11/8/13 and 11/15/13 hearings. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 107 AMENDED FINAL JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Filing 106 Reply Claim Construction Brief, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Hanle, #2 Exhibit A to Hanle Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Hanle Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Hanle Declaration)(Related document(s)) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/30/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 Filing 105 Administrative Motion for Order Authorizing Defendants to Bring Equipment to Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified on 10/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #99 Motion Authorizing Equipment to be brought into Courtroom (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 103 Reply Declaration of James W. Geriak in Support of #90 Motion to Modify Case Managment Conference Scheduling Order and Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/23/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/24/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2013 Filing 102 Reply to Opposition re #90 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint and Modify Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/23/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 Filing 101 Declaration of Joshua Stowell in Support of #100 Response to AngioScore's Claim Construction Brief, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #100 ) (Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 10/22/2013) Modified on 10/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #94 Opening Claim Construction Brief, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Re, Joseph) (Filed on 10/22/2013) Modified on 10/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 Filing 99 MOTION for Order Authorizing Equipment be Brought in for Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2013. Replies due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 10/21/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2013 Filing 98 Memorandum in Opposition re #90 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint and Modify Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sheila N. Swaroop, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration Elton Satusky)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/16/2013) Modified on 10/17/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2013 Filing 97 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sheila N. Swaroop, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 96 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Angioscore, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andre de la Cruz, #2 Exhibit 1 to 9 to Decl of de la Cruz)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 95 Declaration of Andre De La Cruz in Support of #94 Brief: Opening Claim Construction Brief, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #94 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/8/2013) Modified on 10/9/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2013 Filing 94 Brief: Opening Claim Construction Brief, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Horzewski)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/8/2013) Modified on 10/9/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF [DKT. NO. 92);ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SCHEDULING ORDER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 11/8/2013 09:30 AM. Plaintiff Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2013. Defendant response filed 10/14/13. Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by 4/22/2014. Fact Discovery Cutoff is 1/17/2014. Motion to Modify CMC Scheduling Order and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint filed by 10/2/2013. Responses due by 10/16/2013. Replies due by 10/23/2013. Motion Hearing set for Friday, 11/8/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Deadline to Complete PRIVATE MEDIATION is 1/31/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 9/22/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 8/15/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hearing on any Summary Judgment and or Daubert Motion is set for 5/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pre-Filing Conference for summary judgement motions is set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/8/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 92 Discovery Letter Brief REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING TRIREME'S SUPPLIERS filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 91 Declaration of James W. Geriak in Support of #90 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint and Modify Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/2/2013) Modified on 10/3/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2013 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint and Modify Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Order)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/2/2013) Modified on 10/3/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re #88 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Motion for Order Compelling Production of Documents Responsive to AngioScore's Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 18-24 filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc. ; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING for Friday, 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/1/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 88 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Motion for Order Compelling Production of Documents Responsive to AngioScore's Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 18-24 filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Discovery Responses to AngioScore's RFP Nos. 18-24)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/24/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATED ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #77 Stipulation re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE/OSC HEARING SET FOR 9/3/2013 AT 9:30AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/28/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 84 Joint Discovery Letter Brief -- Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 4 & 5 to TriReme and No. 1 to Konstantino filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 83 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING 8/27/13 OSC DATE AND RESETTING FOR 9/3/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/3/2013 09:30 AM.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF COMPLIANT LETTER BRIEF AND ORDERING PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT;S STANDING ORDER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set Tuesday, 8/27/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5.Joint Letter Brief filed by 8/28/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/26/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 81 Letter from Sheila Swaroop on Behalf of Defendants submitting Exhibit 4 to Docket Entries 79 & 80. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 to Docket Entries 79 & 80)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 80 Discovery Letter Brief re AngioScore's Interrogatory No. 1 to Konstantino filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatory No. 1 to Konstantino, #2 Exhibit 2 - Konstantino Response to Interrogatory No. 1, #3 Exhibit 3 - Konstantino Supp. Response to Interrogatory No. 1)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 79 Discovery Letter Briefre AngioScore's Interrogatory Nos. 4 & 5 filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AngioScore's Interrogatory Nos. 4 & 5, #2 Exhibit 2 - TriReme's Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 4 & 5, #3 Exhibit 3 - TriReme's First Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 4 & 5)(De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 78 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (Patent L.R. 4.3), filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitain Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2013 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 8/16/2013) Modified on 8/19/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CORRECTED MODIFIED ORDER RE PLAINTIFF ANGIOSCORE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DISREGARD ENTRY, ATTACHMENT INCORRECT. SEE DKT. NO. 75 FOR CORRECT ENTRY MODIFIED ORDER RE PLAINTIFF ANGIOSCORE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS re #73 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2013 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 07/23/13 (Date Filed: 7/23/2013). (Court Reporter: NOT REPORTED.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2013) Modified on 7/29/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Filing 73 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2013) Modified on 7/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance of Steven Mark Hanle, filed by AngioScore, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 6/21/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/5/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/31/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 70 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 5/29/2013) Modified on 5/30/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Filing 69 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 22, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2013. (Related documents(s) #68 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #63 Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice certain Counterclaims of Trireme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino as to U.S. Patent 7,931,663 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 67 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2013 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 4/22/2013). Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Claims Construction Hearing set for Friday, 11/15/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for Friday, 11/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 65 DISREGARD. ATTACHMENT IS INCORRECT. Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2013 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 4/22/2013). Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Claims Construction Hearing set for Friday, 11/15/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for Friday, 11/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/25/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2013 Filing 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Without Prejudice Certain Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc., and Eitan Konstantino as to USP 7,931,663, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 4/19/2013) Modified on 4/22/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2013 Filing 62 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 4/15/2013) Modified on 4/16/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Andre De La Cruz (De La Cruz, Andre) (Filed on 3/29/2013) Modified on 4/1/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information, filed by James W. Geriak (Geriak, James) (Filed on 3/25/2013) Modified on 3/26/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #58 Stipulation for Continuation of Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuation of Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
December 20, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE 12/21/2012 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING PURSUANT TO Dkt. No. 53. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 19, 2012 Filing 57 [Corrected] Joint Statement Advising of Name of Mediator, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/19/2012) Modified on 12/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2012 Filing 56 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #57 *** Joint Statement Advising of Name of Mediator, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/19/2012) Modified on 12/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2012 Filing 55 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #15 Counterclaim, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 12/18/2012) Modified on 12/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying #26 Motion for Sanctions; denying #23 Motion to Strike (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 4, 2012 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held and on 12/4/2012 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 12/4/2012) re #23 MOTION to Strike, or Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino filed by Angioscore, Inc., is DENIED; #26 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. is DENIED. Case referred to Private ADR to Private Mediation. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/12 is VACATED and RESET for 3/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday 12/21/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Statement filed by 12/19/12.(Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua Stowell as Counsel, filed by Trireme Medical, Inc., Eitan Konstantino (Stowell, Joshua) (Filed on 12/3/2012) Modified on 12/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2012 Filing 51 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 27, 2012 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Peter K. Johansson (Corrective Declaration re: Typographical Error in Dkt. 33) in Opposition to #26 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed byAngioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 49 Discovery Letter Brief(Response to November 6, 2012 Order (D.I. 46)) filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 7, 2012 Filing 48 Corrected Objection to Reply re #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/7/2012) Modified on 11/8/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2012 Filing 47 Objection to Reply re #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/7/2012) Modified on 11/8/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #45 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoena Served by Defendants on Third Party Peter K. Johansson (for deposition on Thursday, November 8, 2012) filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/6/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 Filing 45 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoena Served by Defendants on Third Party Peter K. Johansson (for deposition on Thursday, November 8, 2012), filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 11/5/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2012 Filing 44 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #42 Reply to Opposition filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #42 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified on 11/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2012 Filing 43 Supplemental Declaration of Maria Pizarro in Support of #42 Reply to Opposition filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #42 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified on 11/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2012 Filing 42 REPLY (re #26 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 ) filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 40 DECLARATION of James W. Geriak in Opposition to #37 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 10/31/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2012 Filing 39 Memorandum in Opposition re #37 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 10/31/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #37 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Opposition/Response to Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 37 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Opposition/Response to Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION re #23 MOTION to Strike, or Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino filed by Angioscore, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Strike, or Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/24/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 24, 2012 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Charles A. Kertell in Support of Opposition to #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Kertell, Charles) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 Filing 34 DECLARATION of James W. Geriak in Support of Opposition to #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Peter K. Johansson in Support of Opposition to #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition re #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2012 Filing 31 Reply Memorandum re #23 Motion to Strike, or Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition re #23 Motion to Strike, or Dismiss, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying AngioScore's Motion)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2012 Filing 29 Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 4, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/10/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2012 Filing 28 Supplemental Declaration of Sheila N. Swaroop in Support of #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed byEitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/10/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2012 Filing 27 Declaration of Maria Pizarro in Support of #26 Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/10/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/24/2012. Replies due by 10/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 5, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE 10/15/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESETTING FOR 12/17/2012. Case Management Conference is reset for 12/17/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Also note, if not already submitted, an updated Case Management Conference Statement is required per the Local Rules. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)
October 1, 2012 Filing 25 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. (Kertell, Charles) (Filed on 10/1/2012) Modified on 10/2/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 Filing 24 Declaration of Charles A. Kertell in Support of #23 Motion to Strike or Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Kertell, Charles) (Filed on 9/28/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike, or Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of TriReme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino, filed by Angioscore, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/12/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geriak, James) (Filed on 9/28/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #21 Joint Stipulation Requesting a Continuance of the Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Initial Case Management Conference is continued from 10/1/2012 to 10/15/2012 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting a Continuance of the Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Kertell, Charles) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of William Gerard von Hoffmann, III as Counsel filed by Trireme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino (von Hoffmann, William) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph Robert Re as Counsel, filed by Trireme Medical, Inc. and Eitan Konstantino (Re, Joseph) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 Filing 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation, filed by Angioscore, Inc., Trireme Medical, Inc., Quattro Vascular PTE Ltd., Eitan Konstantino. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified on 9/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by TriReme Medical, Inc., Eitan Konstantino and counsel (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Three Arch Partners, Other Affiliate Adams Street Partners, Other Affiliate EDBI Pte Ltd. for Trireme Medical, Inc.. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #14 (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 15 Answer to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Angioscore, Inc. by Trireme Medical, Inc., Eitan Konstantino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 9/5/2012) Modified on 9/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 14 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #16 . *** Certificate of Interested Entities and Fed. R. Civ. P 7.1 Disclosure, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/6/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 13 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #15 . *** ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM Against AngioScore, Inc., with Jury Demand, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/5/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT with jury demand, against All Defendants. Filed by Angioscore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified on 8/17/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2012 Filing 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by AngioScore, Inc.. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/20/2012) Modified on 7/23/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2012 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants TriReme Medical and Eitan Konstantino to Respond to Complaint, filed by Eitan Konstantino, Trireme Medical, Inc., Angioscore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Swaroop, Sheila) (Filed on 7/19/2012) Modified on 7/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Summons on TriReme Medical, Inc., filed by Angioscore, Inc. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Summons on Eitan Konstantino/Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence on Eitan Konstantino, filed by Angioscore, Inc. (Geriak, James) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2012 Filing 7