Doe v. Hamburg et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius and Margaret Hamburg
Case Number: 4:2012cv03412
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Order Changing Time of CMC filed by Margaret Hamburg, Kathleen Sebelius Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Order Changing Time filed by Margaret Hamburg, Kathleen Sebelius Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Request for Order Changing Time re motion to dismiss and CMC filed by Margaret Hamburg, Kathleen Sebelius Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Vacating the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2013. Case Management Conference reset for 2/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 24 CHANGING TIME. Case Management Conference continued to 2/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Response due by 11/5/12; Reply due by 12/3/2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously Using a Pseudonym (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Margaret Hamburg, Kathleen Sebelius. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 8/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hamburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Sang H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Hamburg
Represented By: Sang H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Amber Dale Abbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?