Dodge v. FoodMatch, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Dodge
Defendant: FoodMatch, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03650
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ODER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/20/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 17 STIPULATION To Continue The Deadlines for Discovery Cutoff and Disclosure of Final Round of Experts. Discovery due by 8/1/2013. Expert Witness List due by 8/29/2013. Jury Selection set for 1/8/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Fl oor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013) Modified on 4/8/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 12 Stipulation to Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodge v. FoodMatch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dodge
Represented By: P. Bobby Shukla
Represented By: Stephen Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FoodMatch, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Farbstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?