Pooka Pooka L.L.C. v. Safari Beach Club LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pooka Pooka L.L.C.
Defendant: Peter Sicilian, Safari Beach Club LLC and Danielle Palmitesso
Case Number: 4:2012cv03817
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/14/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE re 28 . Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on April 18, 2013.(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT UNDER SUBMISSION AND VACATING THE HEARING DATE re 23 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to All Defendants filed by Pooka Pooka L.L.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/27/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 19 . Order. Signed by Masgistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/18/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Status Report due by 12/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/26/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pooka Pooka L.L.C. v. Safari Beach Club LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Sicilian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safari Beach Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Palmitesso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pooka Pooka L.L.C.
Represented By: Ray Khem Shahani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?