Albano v. Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Argentes R. Albano
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, American Brokers Conduit, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv04018
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION 67 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 25, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 64 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on August 27, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on August 12, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 58 Stipulation; denying 59 Motion to Appear by Telephone (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 American Brokers Conduit terminated., ORDER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on March 18, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss; granting 38 Motion to Strike; and ORDER to Show Cause (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on February 4, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 43 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 47 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 27 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albano v. Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argentes R. Albano
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Eric Tsai
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Represented By: Cuong Minh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brokers Conduit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cuong Minh Nguyen
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Represented By: Eric Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Cuong Minh Nguyen
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Represented By: Eric Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Cuong Minh Nguyen
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Represented By: Eric Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?