Roussel v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Roussel
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDEX West LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv04057
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set/Reset Hearings, 66 Case Management Conference - Initial, Case Referred to Mediation,, Set Hearings, filed by Eric Roussel. Case Management Conference reset for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM. Mediation Hearing reset for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/20/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER g ranting 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Reset Deadlines as to 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 12/21/2012. Replies due by 1/2/2013.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, DIRECTING AMENDMENT, AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/25/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 Order on Ex Parte Application To Extend Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearing on Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Reset Deadlines Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 10/10/2012. Replies due by 10/12/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/17/2012 03:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/5/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 26 Ex Parte Application. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roussel v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Roussel
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Represented By: Masumi Jagdish Patel
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?