Shek v. Childrens Hospital Research Center of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: John Shek
Defendant: Brenda Husband, Children Hospital Research Center in Oakland and Cedric Wilson
Case Number: 4:2012cv04517
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF by Judge William Alsup [denying 103 Motion for New Trial; denying 104 Motion to Stay; granting 105 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 113 Motion]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER (1) DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, (2) DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPERATIVE PLEADING, AND (3) DENYING PERMISSION TO COMMENCE DISCOVERY AND TRANSCRIPTS REQUEST by Judge William Alsup [denying 70 Motion for Leave to File; denying 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 93 Motion for Discovery]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CHANGE HEARING DATE. Response due by noon 3/15/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER SETTING HEARING re 70 MOTION for Leave to File filed by John Shek, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 70 MOTION for Leave to File : Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER SETTING HEARING re 70 MOTION for Leave to File filed by John Shek (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF [re 57 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 25 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shek v. Childrens Hospital Research Center of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Husband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children Hospital Research Center in Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?