Rahman v. Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mahbub Rahman
Defendant: Randy Stone, Corey Cottingham and Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv04535
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 1, 2013 to February 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON. The request is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahman v. Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Cottingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahbub Rahman
Represented By: David James McGlothlin
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?