In re Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Steven N. Bell
Defendant: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., Robert J. Pera, Peter Y. Chung, Christopher J. Crespi, Charles J. Fitzgerald, John L. Ocampo, Robert M. Van Buskirk, UBS Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Thinkequity LLC and John Ritchie
Case Number: 4:2012cv04677
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 125 Motion re Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/8/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 56 Motion to Dismiss; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs have leave to file a second consolidated amended complaint within 21 days of the signature date of this order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder, 57 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2013 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 8/27/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/27/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 49 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Charles J. Fitzgerald, Robert J. Pera, Peter Y. Chung, John Ritchie, Robert M. Van Buskirk, Christopher J. Crespi, Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., John L. Ocampo. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven N. Bell
Represented By: Catherine J. Kowalewski
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Christopher Paul Seefer
Represented By: David Conrad Walton
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Pera
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Y. Chung
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Crespi
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Ocampo
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Van Buskirk
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Crest Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thinkequity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ritchie
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?