Discover Bank v. Jensen
Plaintiff: Discover Bank
Defendant: Joanna L. Jensen
Case Number: 4:2012cv04871
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/2/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 31 Motion to be excused from personally attending settlement conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 27 Motion Excuse Attendance at Settlement Conference (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discover Bank v. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discover Bank
Represented By: Peter Russell Osterman
Represented By: Jerome Michael Yalon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?