St. Louis Police Retirement Systems v. Severson et al
Plaintiff: St. Louis Police Retirement Systems
Defendant: Henk J. Evenhuis, Prithipal Singh, Vernon E. Altman, Ernest S. Tucker, Clinton H. Severson, Alberto R. Santa Ines, Kenneth P. Aron, Vladimir E. Ostoich, Donald P. Wood, Martin V. Mulroy, Richard J. Bastiani and Michael D. Casey
Case Number: 4:2012cv05086
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 106 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $579,429.53 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The Compliance Hearing set Friday, January 24, 2014 at 9:01AM is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/23/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 12/13/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/3/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Motions terminated: 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) filed by Ernest S. Tucker, Michael D. Casey, Richard J. Bastiani, Henk J. Evenhuis, Vernon E. Altman, Prithipal Singh, Clinton H. Severson, 62 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of the Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) filed by Alberto R. Santa Ines, Donald P. Wood, Martin V. Mulroy, Kenneth P. Aron, Vladimir E. Ostoich, Clinton H. Severson.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/19/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE: FURTHER BRIEFING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), 62 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of the Complaint Pursu ant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6). Plaintiff brief filed 4/16/2013; Defendants briefs filed 4/23/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2013 is CONTINUED to 5/7/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/5/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), 62 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of the Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6). Motions Hearing set for 3/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 3/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/1/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS re 53 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Alberto R. Santa Ines, Donald P. Wood, Ernest S. Tucker, Richard J. Bastiani, Henk J. Evenhuis, Kenneth P. Aron, Vladimir E. Ostoich, Clinton H. Severson, Michael D. Casey, Martin V. Mulroy, Vernon E. Altman, Prithipal Singh, Attorney George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Vernon E. Altman,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Kenneth P. Aron,George H. Brown, Enrique Antonio Monagas for Richard J. Bastiani,Thad Alan Davis,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Michael D. Casey,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Henk J. Evenhuis,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Martin V. Mulroy,Ge orge H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Vladimir E. Ostoich,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Alberto R. Santa Ines,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Clinton H. Severson,Thad Alan Davis,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas fo r Prithipal Singh,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Ernest S. Tucker,George H. Brown,Enrique Antonio Monagas for Donald P. Wood added. Attorney Adam Christopher Trigg; John C. Dwyer and Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/19/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CLARIFYING THE ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SUBSTITUTING A BOND FOR THE POSTED SECURITY re 48 Proposed Order filed by St. Louis Police Retirement Systems. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/29/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME ON THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 5 Motion to Shorten Time. Defendant's Response filed 10/15/12; Plaintiff's Reply filed 10/18/12. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set Tuesday, October 23, 2012 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Louis Police Retirement Systems v. Severson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henk J. Evenhuis
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prithipal Singh
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon E. Altman
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest S. Tucker
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton H. Severson
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto R. Santa Ines
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth P. Aron
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir E. Ostoich
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald P. Wood
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin V. Mulroy
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Bastiani
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Casey
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Police Retirement Systems
Represented By: Eric L. Zagar
Represented By: Robin Winchester
Represented By: Joseph Edward White, III
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Stein
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Represented By: James Hunter Miller, Jr
Represented By: Lester Rene Hooker
Represented By: Matthew Alec Goldstein
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?