Williams v. Fillmore Center Associates, LP et al
Plaintiff: Emma Williams
Defendant: Laramar Apartments and Fillmore Center Associates, LP
Case Number: 4:2012cv05285
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/11/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/24/14. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting a Status Conference. Status Report due by 2/14/2014. Status Conference set for 2/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Trial date and schedule set. Case referred to a Magistrate Judge for a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/24/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/15/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Fillmore Center Associates, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramar Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fillmore Center Associates, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Williams
Represented By: Phillip Richard Morgan
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?