January 26, 2016 |
Filing
237
ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY COURT'S ORDER APPROVING PARTIES' SECOND MODIFIED FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 230 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
236
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 230 MOTION for Settlement Joint Notice of Amended Motion and Motion to Modify Court's July 2, 2015 Order Granting Motion For Approval of Parties' Second Modified FLSA Collective Action Settlement filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Lukas Biewald. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
|
October 16, 2015 |
Filing
229
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY COURT'S ORDER APPROVING PARTIES' SECOND MODIFIED FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 227 Motion To Modify The Court's July 2, 2015 Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
226
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PARTIES' SECOND MODIFIED FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT, FINAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES ONLY, AND AUTHORIZATION FOR THE PARTIES TO EFFECTUATE THEIR SETTLEMENT, AND DENYING REQUEST FOR TOLLING by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 218 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
|
June 23, 2015 |
Filing
225
ORDER re 224 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Lukas Biewald. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
223
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 218 MOTION for Settlement filed by Christopher Otey, Mary Greth. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
|
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
217
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Stipulation for a 7-Day Extension of Time to File New Motion for Settlement Approval and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Lukas Biewald Further Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
|
March 13, 2015 |
Filing
215
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for a 15-Day Extension to File New Motion for Settlement Approval and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference and [Proposed Order] filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Lukas Biewald. Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
212
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 211 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for a 30-Day Extension of Time to File New Motion for Settlement Approval and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
209
ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 207 MOTION for Settlement filed by Christopher Otey, Mary Greth. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
|
July 25, 2014 |
Filing
200
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 199 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR A FURTHER BRIEF TWO-WEEK EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE NEW MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL filed by Crowdflower, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
198
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR BRIEF TWO-WEEK EXTENSION OF TIIME TO FILE NEW MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL filed by Crowdflower, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
195
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 187 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing
191
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 187 MOTION for Settlement COMBINED NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Christopher Otey, Mary Greth. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
|
February 10, 2014 |
Filing
190
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 186 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Lukas Biewald. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
|
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
183
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 182 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DECEMBER 11, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Crowdflower, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
181
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS 150 AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 155 . Signed by District Judge Jon S. Tigar. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
177
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 176 Joint MOTION to Continue Litigation Activities Pending Mediation Scheduled for October 18 and 19, 2013 filed by Christopher Otey, Mary Greth. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
175
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 174 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
171
ORDER VACATING HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST AS MOOT re 150 MOTION to Dismiss, 155 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. DENYING as moot: 170 Joint MOTION Consolidate Case Management Conference and Arguments on September 12, 2013. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
167
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 46 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
146
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 132 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 124]; denying 136 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 124]; denying 140 MOTION for Relief from Nondispostive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 126. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
|
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
126
Discovery Order re: 118 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiff's Deposition filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Lukas Biewald. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/24/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
123
Discovery Order re: 105 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Christopher Otey.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/20/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
|
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
120
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD OPT-IN PLAINTIFF MARY GRETH AS ADDITIONAL NAMED PLAINTIFF filed by Christopher Otey. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
|
June 11, 2013 |
Filing
108
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification and Defendants' Response to Pending Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Chris Van Pelt, Crowdflower, Inc., Christopher Otey, Lukas Biewald. Supplemental Memorandum in support due 6/14/2013. Memorandum in opposition due 6/28/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
99
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PENDING MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Crowdflower, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
96
AMENDED ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND STAY DISCOVERY; DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 44 MOTION to Bifurcate, 92 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
|
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
86
ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 44 MOTION to Bifurcate Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Bifurcate Discovery and to Stay Merits/Class Certification Discovery and Motions, re 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 77 Discovery Letter Brief (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Hearing and Briefing Dates for Pending Motions filed by Chris Van Pelt, et al. Reset Hearing as to 71 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings P's Notice of Motion and Motio n for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, 44 MOTION to Bifurcate Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Bifurcate Discovery and to Stay Merits/Class Certification Discovery and Motions, 46 MOTION to Certify Class [PLA INTIFFS MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/22/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
73
DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting Defendants' protective order request re: 72 Discovery Letter Brief (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
|
February 1, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES FOR PENDING MOTIONS filed by Christopher Otey. Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Bifurcate Defendants' Motio n and Memorandum of Law to Bifurcate Discovery and to Stay Merits/Class Certification Discovery and Motions. Responses to motion to bifurcate due by 2/7/2013. Replies due by 2/14/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
|
January 4, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER grantingnated: 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 23 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Christopher Otey. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/1/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
19
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 18 Stipulation (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
|
November 2, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
|