Softvault Systems, Inc. v. Novell, Inc.
Plaintiff: SoftVault Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Novell, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05541
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 40 Stipulation to Modify Schedule.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Novell, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 22, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 31 .
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER (correcting case number from 13-cv-00750 to 13-00754). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/13/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 27 Motion to Relate Case (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Softvault Systems, Inc. v. Novell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SoftVault Systems, Inc.
Represented By: P.J. Benedict O'Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?