Nextdoor.com, Inc. v. Abhyanker
Plaintiff: Nextdoor.com, Inc.
Defendant: Raj Abhyanker
Case Number: 4:2012cv05667
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER re 415 STIPULATION AND FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL Proposed Order filed by Nextdoor.com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER Re: Pretrial Filings (emclc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 398 AMENDED ORDER RE PRE-TRIAL FILINGS re 397 Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER Regarding pre-trial filings (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/14/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 303 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FROM DEFENDANT Re: Dkt. No. 328. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/10/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S UPDATED PRIVILEGE LOG. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on September 5, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 323 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Resetting Status Conference and Motion Hearing for Nextdoor.com, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Claims for Declaratory Relief for Lack of Justiciability filed by Nextdoor.c om, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 323 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Resetting Status Conference and Motion Hearing for Nextdoor.com, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Claims for Declaratory Relief for Lack of Justiciability, 303 MOT ION to Dismiss Nextdoor.com, Inc.'s Claims for Declaratory Relief for Lack of Justiciability. Status Report due by 9/10/2014. Status Conference set for 9/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins setting deposition schedule; denying defendant's motion for reconsideration or to reopen discovery. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO UPDATE PRIVILEGE LOG. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on August 18, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins regarding discovery disputes 294 304 (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins regarding discovery disputes 265 266 267 . (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 8, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE Re: Dkt. Nos. 213 [227 228 232 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/1/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Abhyanker's counsel shall file under seal, by July 2, 2014, a declaration setting forth the factual basis for their belief that they are ethically required to withdraw. The declaration(s) and other pleadings, if any, shall be served on Mr. Abhyanker, who may file a response under seal by July 7, 2014. I will hold a hearing ex parte, in camera, on July 10, 2014 at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 2, 17th floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Assigning 217 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Re 217 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 234 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 217 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Bruno Tarabichi, Heather Norton, Scott Allen, Roy Montgomery and Brian Orion Stipulation to Advance Hearing Date filed by Raj Abhyanker, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 234 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 217 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Bruno Tarabichi, Heather Norton, Scott Allen, Roy Montgomery and Brian Orion Stipulation to Advance Hearing Date , 217 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Bruno Tarabichi, Heather Norton, Scott Allen, Roy Montgomery and Brian Orion. Responses due by 6/27/2014. Replies due by 7/2/2014. Motion Hearing reset for 7/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/23/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Remaining Counterclaims With Prejudice filed by Raj Abhyanker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Re (1) Discovery Letter Briefs of June 9 and June 10, 2014 213 214 ; (2) Withdrawal of Discovery Referral to Magistrate Judge Corley; and (3) Referral to Magistrate Judge for All Discovery Purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/2014. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Abhyanker's) filed by Benchmark Capital Management Co. VII LLC, Benchmark Capital Partners VII, L.P.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Re 206 Parties' Discovery Letter Brief of June 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/5/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Re (Docket No. 197-3) Parties' Joint Discovery Letter Brief of May 27, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Partial Dismissal and Declaratory Judgment filed by Nextdoor.com, Inc., Prakesh Janakiraman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 143 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 145 Counterdefendant Benchmark Capital's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting 115 Defendant Abhyanker's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims; and (2) Denying 122 Plaintiff Nextdoor.com's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 Protective Order filed by Monsoon Company, Nextdoor.com, Inc., Sandeep Sood, Prakesh Janakiraman, Raj Abhyanker, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part Counter-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Counterclaim; Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses; and Denying Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 63 70 88 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RESETTING CMC for 6/6/13 at 1:30 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 to Continue Initial CMC to April 18, 2013 filed by Raj Abhyanker Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nextdoor.com, Inc. v. Abhyanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nextdoor.com, Inc.
Represented By: Laurence F. Pulgram
Represented By: Jennifer Lloyd Kelly
Represented By: Guinevere Louise Jobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raj Abhyanker
Represented By: Kuscha Hatami Fard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?