Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. HVFG, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund and Regal Vegan, Inc.
Defendant: Izzy Yanay, Richard Bishop, HVFG, L.L.C., Marcus Henley and Michael Ginor
Case Number: 4:2012cv05809
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE DISCOVERY LETTERS by Judge Alsup terminating 107 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 111 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 112 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 91 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER regarding settlement conference. See order for urgent directives. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/11/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 76 Letter filed by Regal Vegan, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, 77 Letter filed by Michael Ginor, Izzy Yanay, HVFG, L.L.C., Richard Bishop, Marcus Henley, 78 Letter filed by Regal Vegan, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES [re 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Ginor, Izzy Yanay, HVFG, L.L.C., Richard Bishop, Marcus Henley]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/29/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER COMBINING HEARINGS [re 59 MOTION to Strike 52 Answer to Complaint filed by Regal Vegan, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, 65 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Michael Ginor, Izzy Yanay, HVFG, L.L.C., Richard Bishop, Marcus Henley]. Motions Hearing set for 6/20/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/21/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 62 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 56 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 53 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. HVFG, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Nicole Alexandria Roth
Represented By: John P Melia
Represented By: Carter Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regal Vegan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izzy Yanay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVFG, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ginor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?