Miller v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05978
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT] filed by Robert Miller., JUDGMENT/JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/21/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 36 MOTION to Certify Class [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES] filed by Robert Miller. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/17/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 MOTION SEEKING ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SET HEARING [Local Rule 7-11] [UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SEEKING ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SET HEARING - Local Rule 7-11]. Motion(preliminary approval) Hearing and Further Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue the case management conference of May 10, 2013 filed by Southwest Airlines Co. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/16/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Southwest Airlines Co. and Plaintiffs filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Deadline pndng outcome of P's class certification motion. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Alex Paul Katofsky
Represented By: Sepideh Hirmand
Represented By: Kenneth Steven Gaines
Represented By: Daniel Franklin Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?