Randle v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Sherene Randle
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 4:2012cv06031
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 21 Second MOTION to Remand AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT; filed by Sherene Randle. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ISSUING FURTHER ORDER RE SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND VACATING HEARING DATE. Motions terminated: 6 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 01/17/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/15/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randle v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace
Represented By: Josi Kennon Swonetz
Represented By: Keith David Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherene Randle
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Represented By: Russell A Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?