PeopleBrowsr, Inc. et al v. Twitter, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: PeopleBrowsr, Inc. and PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd.
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv06120
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE by PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ATTORNEYS' FEES BRIEF filed by PeopleBrowsr, Inc., PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 35 Declaration of BEATRICE B. NGUYEN in Support of 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ATTORNEYS' FEES BRIEF filed byPeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc.. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ATTORNEYS' FEES BRIEF filed by PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc.. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 26, 2013 Filing 33 Receipt from San Francisco Superior Court re remand order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Order on Motion to Remand Extending Time for Fees Brief filed by Twitter, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Order on Motion to Remand Extending Time for Fees Brief filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Page)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 30 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/31/2013, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2013. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 8, 2013 Filing 29 Certified copy of docket sheet and remand order mailed to San Francisco Superior Court. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 12 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 4, 2013 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CMC FROM 3/7/13 TO 4/11/13. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 26 Minute Entry: ***Deadlines terminated. 12 MOTION to Remand filed by PeopleBrowsr, Inc., PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Twitter, Inc. Court took matter under submission and will issue order. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy Yen on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Yen, Lucy) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Sher on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Sher, Scott) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 22 REPLY (re 12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byPeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Updated Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 21 REPLY (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re 1 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 19 RESPONSE (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss ) / Opposition to Twitter, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byPeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Twitter, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by PeopleBrowsr, Inc. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 16 RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 27, 2012 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitter, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/10/2013. Replies due by 1/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/10/2013. Replies due by 1/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO REMAND filed by Twitter, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO REMAND filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order CONTINUING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO REMAND)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/10/12. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd., PeopleBrowsr, Inc... (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twitter, Inc... (Page, Michael) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2013 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC12-526393. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611081095). Filed byTwitter, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PeopleBrowsr, Inc. et al v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PeopleBrowsr, Inc.
Represented By: Beatrice B. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PeopleBrowsr Pty., Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory D. Call
Represented By: Michael Alexander Kahn
Represented By: Beatrice B. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Michael H Page
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?