Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd v. Flextronics International, LTD.
Plaintiff: Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd
Defendant: Power Systems Technologies LTD. and Flextronics International, LTD.
Case Number: 4:2012cv06317
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER RE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS FROM MARCH 12 DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO A RANDOMLY-ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 43 Case Management Scheduling Order, 116 Letter filed by Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd, 118 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Power Systems Technologies LTD., Flextronics International, LTD., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 116 Letter filed by Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd ] Response due by 9:00 a.m. on 3/11/2014. 3-Hour meet-and-confer from 7:30--10:30 AM 3/12/2014 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 3/12/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 7, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 113 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATED DISCOVERY ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 111 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 107 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd.] Response due by NOON ON 12/24/2013. 3-Hour meet-and-confer from 7:30--10:30 AM 12/26/2013 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 12/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/20/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL by Hon. William Alsup denying 91 Motion to Compel.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE 91 MOTION to Compel filed by Power Systems Technologies LTD., Flextronics International, LTD., 82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Systems Technologies LTD., Flextronics International, LTD.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on December 9, 2013. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING NOTO PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 67 Motion for Leave to File; denying 70 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 79 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Judge Alsup terminating 81 Discovery Letter Brief; finding as moot 82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 73 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE AND DENYING REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME by Hon. William Alsup denying 71 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF PRIBISICH by Hon. William Alsup granting 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Risto Pribisich terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 56 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SAC by Hon. William Alsup granting 52 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING WOODEN PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 46 Motion for Protective Order.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup denying 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REQUEST FOR STATUS REPORT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd v. Flextronics International, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Systems Technologies LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flextronics International, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd
Represented By: Frederick S. Frei
Represented By: Daniel J. Bergeson
Represented By: Leasa W Anderson
Represented By: Kyung M. Lee
Represented By: Jaideep Venkatesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?