Lifescan, Inc. et al v. Shasta Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lifescan, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Defendant: Shasta Technologies, LLC, Conductive Technologies, Inc., Decision Diagnostics Corp. and Pharmatech Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv06360
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS re 122 Statement. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/08/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER MODIFYING INJUNCTION; DENYING MOTION TO STAY; SETTING BOND; GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 100 Motion for Bond; granting 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 106 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER STAYING ACTION re 83 Order to Show Cause, 84 Response to Order to Show Cause, 85 Response. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The hearing on motions 14 and 40 is vacated. Plaintiffs must respond to this order by 3/27/13. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 55 Motion to Expedite.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 7, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifescan, Inc. et al v. Shasta Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conductive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision Diagnostics Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey Harrison Grant
Represented By: Carole Enid Handler
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmatech Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Harrison Grant
Represented By: Carole Enid Handler
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifescan, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A Williams
Represented By: Sean R Marshall
Represented By: Susan Dana Roeder
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Represented By: William Francis Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William Francis Cavanaugh
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Sean R Marshall
Represented By: Susan Dana Roeder
Represented By: Catherine A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?